Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828539

EP2828539 - SELF-ALIGNING MINIATURE BALL BEARINGS WITH PRESS-FIT AND SELF-CLINCHING CAPABILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spyraflo, Inc.
404 Dividend Drive
P.O. Box 2309
Peachtree City, GA 30269 / US
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / GUTHRIE, Alan, C.
7960 Highway 54
Sharpsburg, GA 30277 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
PartG mbB
Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date12714427.720.03.2012
[2019/03]
WO2012US29803
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141849
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828539
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828539
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16C23/08, F16C35/067, F16C19/06
[2018/30]
Former International [2015/05]F16C23/08, F16C35/067
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SELBSTAUSRICHTENDES MINIKUGELLAGER MIT AUFPRESS- UND EINPRESSFÄHIGKEIT[2015/05]
English:SELF-ALIGNING MINIATURE BALL BEARINGS WITH PRESS-FIT AND SELF-CLINCHING CAPABILITIES[2015/05]
French:ROULEMENTS À BILLES MINIATURES ARTICULÉ AYANT DES APTITUDES À L'AJUSTEMENT PRESSÉ ET À L'AUTO-SERTISSAGE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2014National basic fee paid 
16.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
15.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2018Fee for grant paid
06.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
MC16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2011019952  (GUTOWSKI JORDAN ERIC [US] ET AL) [X] 1,14,17 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0034] , [0035] , [0042]; figures 1-3,9 * [Y] 6-12,18-20 [I] 2-5,13,15,16;
 [XYI]JP2009185980  (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 1,13,17 * abstract * [Y] 6-12,18-20 [I] 2-5;
 [YD]US6238096  (ALLEN PETER F [US] ET AL) [YD] 6-12,18-20 * column 6, line 30 - column 8, line 24; figures 2-6 * * column 9, lines 50-65 * * column 8, lines 62-67 * * column 3, lines 24-41 *
by applicantUS5911515
 US6238096