Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2828539 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2828539



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 270
28.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.12.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.12.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.12.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
06.12.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
06.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.08.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.08.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.08.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.08.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
07.08.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 29
19.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.03.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
19.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
19.03.2018 Description Search / examination 1
19.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.03.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.11.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
31.03.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
27.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
29.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.08.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
15.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.06.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
15.06.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 11
15.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
15.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
09.12.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
16.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
16.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 33
20.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
20.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
20.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
16.04.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
16.04.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 6
16.04.2012 Description International Searching Authority 18
16.04.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 8