Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2828539


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
14.12.2018 (Expected) grant published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
11.12.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.12.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.12.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.08.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
30.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.11.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.05.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.03.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.11.2016 First examination report
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2015 Amendment by applicant
22.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
01.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
05.12.2014 Change - representative
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
08.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication