Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2685929

EP2685929 - DENTAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.03.2015
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
22.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOTECH DENTAL
305 Allée de Craponne
13300 Salon-de-Provence / FR
[2014/20]
Former [2014/04]For all designated states
Biotech International
305, allée de Craponne
13300 Salon-de-Provence / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BREYSSE, Pascal
259 Chemin du Ravatel
F-69210 St Germain su l'Arbresle / FR
 [2014/04]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Cabinet Marek
28, rue de la Loge
Boîte Postale 42413
13201 Marseille Cedex 02 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/04]Marek, Pierre
28 Rue de la Loge
B.P. Box 42413
13201 Marseille Cedex 02 / FR
Application number, filing date12714740.315.03.2012
WO2012FR00093
Priority number, dateFR2011000076915.03.2011         Original published format: FR 1100769
[2014/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012123654
Date:20.09.2012
Language:FR
[2012/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2685929
Date:22.01.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012
[2014/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2685929
Date:01.04.2015
Language:FR
[2015/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00
[2014/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZAHNIMPLANTAT[2014/04]
English:DENTAL IMPLANT[2014/04]
French:IMPLANT DENTAIRE[2014/04]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2013National basic fee paid 
13.08.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2013Examination requested  [2014/04]
05.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2015Fee for grant paid
12.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.12.2015  13.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Dentsply Implants Manufacturing GmbH
Steinzeugstrasse 50
68229 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Wesch, Arno
Reble & Klose
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32
68163 Mannheim / DE
 [2017/16]
Former [2016/06]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2015   
Dentsply Implants Manufacturing GmbH
Steinzeugstrasse 50
68229 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Kesselhut, Wolf
Reble & Klose Rechts- und Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32
68163 Mannheim / DE
09.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.06.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0111/18
15.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
22.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0111/18
09.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
19.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.03.2012
AL01.04.2015
AT01.04.2015
BG01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
MK01.04.2015
MT01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
SM01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
IE15.03.2016
LU15.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU15.03.2012
AT01.04.2015
BG01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
MK01.04.2015
MT01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
SM01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
IE15.03.2016
LU15.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU15.03.2012
AT01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
MK01.04.2015
MT01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
SM01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
IE15.03.2016
LU15.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2017/40]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
MT01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
IE15.03.2016
LU15.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
IE15.03.2016
LU15.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
LU15.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
LU15.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/37]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
HR01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
LV01.04.2015
NL01.04.2015
RS01.04.2015
NO01.07.2015
GR02.07.2015
Former [2015/42]NL01.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010055643  (HUNG WILLIAM Y S [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0043] *;
 [A]WO2009009911  (DENTALPOINT AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-9 *
by applicantFR2922752
 US2010248181
 US2010055643