Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2702623 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2702623



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3996
27.03.2023 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.12.2022 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
13.12.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
02.11.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.11.2022 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
26.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.09.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.09.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
26.09.2022 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
27.06.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
05.07.2021 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
30.06.2021 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.02.2020 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.08.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.08.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
30.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
30.07.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
30.07.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 47
30.07.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.07.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 427
30.07.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.07.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.07.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.07.2019 Claims Appeal 8
30.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.07.2019 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
30.07.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
27.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.05.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.05.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 2
24.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.05.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Appeal 1
03.05.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.04.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
28.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
28.03.2019 Means of redress Search / examination 2
28.03.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.09.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.08.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
16.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.08.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
16.08.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.08.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.01.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 175
06.01.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
04.11.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
25.10.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
01.04.2016 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.05.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.05.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
05.02.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.11.2013 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.10.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
22.10.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
19.08.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 217
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 294
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 254
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 145
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 267
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 185
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 197
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 161
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 237
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 154
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 273
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 174
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 231
11.10.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.10.2012 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 282
03.07.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
03.07.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
03.07.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2