EP2664227 - APPARATUS FOR ACTIVELY VENTILATING BUILT-IN COMPONENTS OF A WITHDRAWABLE PART OF A SWITCHGEAR CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRSCHFELD, Stefan Erlanger Str. 12 04207 Leipzig / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Mario Gartengrund 34 04178 Leipzig / DE | 03 /
WOHLFARTH, Jörg Radiusstrasse 22 04179 Leipzig / DE | [2013/47] | Application number, filing date | 12715609.9 | 16.03.2012 | WO2012EP54642 | Priority number, date | DE20111005838 | 21.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011005838 | [2013/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012126821 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664227 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
H05K7/20909 (EP);
H05K7/14325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AKTIVEN BELÜFTEN VON EINBAUTEN EINES EINSCHUBS EINES SCHALTSCHRANKS | [2013/47] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ACTIVELY VENTILATING BUILT-IN COMPONENTS OF A WITHDRAWABLE PART OF A SWITCHGEAR CABINET | [2013/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AÉRATION ACTIVE D'ÉLÉMENTS INSTALLÉS D'UN TIROIR INSÉRABLE D'UNE ARMOIRE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 24.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6688965 (CRIPPEN MARTIN JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** figures 6-7 *; | [I]DE102008019981 (FUTUREE FUEL CELL SOLUTIONS GM [DE]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] * * paragraph [0028] * |