Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2685810

EP2685810 - HUMAN ASSISTED MILKING ROBOT AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mirobot Ltd.
Toyota Tower
Yigal Alon Street 65
67443 Tel-Aviv / IL
[2014/04]
Inventor(s)01 / BAREKET, Tal
Tamar Street 27
36530 Kiryat-Tivon / IL
 [2014/04]
Representative(s)Metten, Karl-Heinz
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/04]Metten, Karl-Heinz
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12715731.114.03.2012
WO2012IL50088
Priority number, dateUS201161453592P17.03.2011         Original published format: US 201161453592 P
US201161453588P17.03.2011         Original published format: US 201161453588 P
[2014/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012123944
Date:20.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2685810
Date:22.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012
[2014/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:A01J5/017
[2014/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/04]
TitleGerman:MENSCHLICH UNTERSTÜTZTER MELKROBOTER UND VERFAHREN[2014/04]
English:HUMAN ASSISTED MILKING ROBOT AND METHOD[2014/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET ROBOT DE TRAITE ASSISTÉ PAR L'HOMME[2014/04]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2013National basic fee paid 
15.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/04]
20.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination04.11.2016Appeal received No.  T0800/17
12.01.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.10.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M01) [2019/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XDY]US2010186675  (VAN DEN BERG KAREL [NL]) [XD] 1-9,16,23-26,29,31-35,37,40 * figures 1,5 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0057] , [0058] , [0060] , [0066] , [0067] , [0071] * [Y] 27,28,46,52;
 [IY]US5697324  (VAN DER LELY CORNELIS [CH]) [I] 44,47,50 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 41 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 4 * [Y] 27,28,46,52;
 [A]WO9930277  (ALFA LAVAL AGRI AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,26,44 * the whole document *;
 [A]NL9100870  (PROLION BV) [A] 43 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6227142
 US7490576
 US7568447
 US2010186675