Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802924

EP2802924 - METHOD FOR DISPLACING AT LEAST ONE DISPLAY CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BOHRER, Lorenz
Schleissheimer Str.29
80333 München / DE
02 / ROEHDER, Martin
Bei der Hollerstaude 8
85049 Ingolstadt / DE
03 / SENNER, Bernhard
Gablerstr. 24
85051 Ingolstadt / DE
04 / HAMBERGER, Werner
Argula-von-Grumbach-Str. 8
85101 Lenting / DE
05 / GÖßMANN, Ewald
Obere Bergstr. 6
93339 Riedenburg / DE
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Brandt, Kai
Audi AG
Patentabteilung I/EZ-1
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date12715842.613.04.2012
WO2012EP01615
Priority number, dateDE2012100019809.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012000198
[2014/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013104376
Date:18.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802924
Date:19.11.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/01
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM VERSCHIEBEN VON MINDESTENS EINEM ANZEIGEINHALT[2014/47]
English:METHOD FOR DISPLACING AT LEAST ONE DISPLAY CONTENT[2014/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉPLACER AU MOINS UN CONTENU AFFICHÉ[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2014National basic fee paid 
11.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
14.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2018992  (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-14 * figures 2-4 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0014] , [0028] , [0038] * [I] 2,5;
 [XI]DE102009032069  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,9,13-15 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] , [0028] , [0037] - [0039] * [I] 2,5;
 [XI]DE102005010843  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,9,11-13 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0016] * [I] 2,5;
 [I]DE102008017716  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [I] 1,2,4,5,13 * figure 1 *;
 [I]US2009256813  (AMICI ALAN J [US], et al) [I] 1-5,11-13 * figure 5 *;
 [A]DE10349568  (MITSUBISHI FUSO TRUCK & BUS [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] *