Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822847

EP2822847 - PERSONAL MOBILITY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.03.2018  [2018/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rollerscoot Ltd.
107 Dartmouth Road
Paignton
Devon TQ4 6NF / GB
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAY, Ian
10 Grange View
Paignton, Devon TQ4 7JF / GB
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Brown, Michael Stanley
Alpha & Omega
Chine Croft
East Hill
Ottery St. Mary, Devon EX11 1PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Brown, Michael Stanley
Alpha and Omega
Chine Croft
East Hill
Ottery St. Mary
Devon, EX11 1PJ / GB
Application number, filing date12716497.809.03.2012
WO2012GB00227
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013132201
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822847
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B62K3/00, B62K5/02, A61G5/04
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUG FÜR PERSÖNLICHE MOBILITÄT[2015/03]
English:PERSONAL MOBILITY VEHICLE[2015/03]
French:VÉHICULE DE MOBILITÉ PERSONNELLE[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
29.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/11]
30.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201605   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.2016
31.03.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]US4802542  (HOUSTON THOMAS T [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,12,14 * column 3, line 67 - column 9, line 13; figure 1 * [I] 5,8,13,15-19;
 [XI]US5265689  (KAUFFMANN RICARDO M [MX]) [X] 1-3,12,14 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 57; figures 1,8 * [I] 13,15-20;
 [XI]US2003141120  (ESPOSITO CHARLES [US]) [X] 1,2,12 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * [I] 3-8,13-19;
 [A]DE20019844U  (BLUEMEL RALF [DE]) [A] 9,10 * abstract *