Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2672805

EP2672805 - DEVICE FOR LOADING AGRICULTURAL GOODS TO BE TRANSPORTED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bäuscher, Robin
Auf den Bischofsbäumen 3
65439 Flörsheim / DE
[2013/51]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2013/51]
Representative(s)Weilnau, Carsten , et al
Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unter den Eichen 5
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
[2015/21]
Former [2013/51]Weilnau, Carsten , et al
Quermann Sturm Weilnau Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date12717038.908.02.2012
WO2012EP00571
Priority number, dateDE2011101078809.02.2011         Original published format: DE102011010788
[2013/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012107223
Date:16.08.2012
Language:DE
[2012/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2672805
Date:18.12.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012
[2013/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2672805
Date:20.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:A01D87/00, E02F3/40, E02F3/407
[2015/01]
Former International [2013/51]A01D87/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LADEEINRICHTUNG FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES TRANSPORTGUT[2013/51]
English:DEVICE FOR LOADING AGRICULTURAL GOODS TO BE TRANSPORTED[2013/51]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT POUR MARCHANDISES AGRICOLES[2013/51]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2013National basic fee paid 
29.08.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/51]
10.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.04.2015Fee for grant paid
09.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.12.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.02.2016  03.03.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Fliegl Agro Center GmbH
Maierhof 1
84556 Kastl / DE
Opponent's representative
Nußbaum, Christopher
Patentanwaltskanzlei Nussbaum
Lessingstraße 4
84561 Mehring / DE
 [2019/31]
Former [2016/13]
Opponent(s)01  19.02.2016   
Fliegl Agro Center GmbH
Maierhof 1
84556 Kastl / DE
Opponent's representative
Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
PartG mbB
Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
31.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.10.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.06.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition25.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1899/17
30.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.02.2012
AL20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE08.02.2016
LU08.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
AT08.02.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/29]HU08.02.2012
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE08.02.2016
LU08.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
AT08.02.2017
Former [2018/28]HU08.02.2012
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE08.02.2016
LU08.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
AT08.02.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE08.02.2016
LU08.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
AT08.02.2017
Former [2017/40]CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE08.02.2016
LU08.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE08.02.2016
LU08.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2016/46]CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU08.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2016/43]CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU08.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/42]CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/21]CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/09]DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/07]DK20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
PT21.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE9208389U  (BERNARD VON LENGERICH MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO) [AD] 1 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 6, line 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2006060065  (CASCADE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0040]; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US3048292  (JOSEPH KOHORST, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 3-61; figures 4-10 *;
 [A]US5603382  (MCIVER ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 59 - column 5, line 27; figures 1-4 *
by applicantDE9208389U
 US3163304
 DE4014283
OppositionDE9208389U
 WO2006060065
 US3048292
 DE202010000352U
 DE4014283
    - "Geräteprogramm", Fliegl-Agro-Center, (20110000), pages 1 - 68, XP055297726
    - "Gebrauchtfahrzeug ASW 268 Giant", Fiegl-Agrartechnik, (20080000), XP055297730
    - "Praxistest Abschiebewagen Fliegl ASW 268: Standfestes Original", Profi, (20070300), pages 28 - 30, XP055297732
    - Hubert Wilmer, "Stabilator, Power-Tube oder Power-Push?", Profi, (20071100), pages 18 - 21, XP055297737