Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2697752

EP2697752 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING INDIVIDUAL SHELF IMAGES FOR DIFFERENT SALES OUTLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.09.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hoffrogge Consulting Company GmbH
Dr. Eckener Strasse 14a
27793 Wildeshausen / DE
[2014/08]
Inventor(s)01 / AMELMANN, Maik
Ahlhorner Str. 13
27793 Wildeshausen / DE
02 / OLTMANN, Stefan
Westerstraße 23
27793 Wildeshausen / DE
03 / HOFFROGGE, Wilhelm
Rövekampstraße 14
27793 Wildeshausen / DE
 [2014/08]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/08]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date12718907.410.04.2012
WO2012EP01550
Priority number, dateEP2011000299509.04.2011         Original published format: EP 11002995
[2014/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012139747
Date:18.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2697752
Date:19.02.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012
[2014/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, G06Q30/00
[2014/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ERSTELLEN VON INDIVIDUELLEN REGALBILDERN FÜR VERSCHIEDENE VERKAUFSSTELLEN[2014/08]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING INDIVIDUAL SHELF IMAGES FOR DIFFERENT SALES OUTLETS[2014/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION D'IMAGES D'ÉTAGÈRES INDIVIDUELLES POUR DIFFÉRENTS POINTS DE VENTE[2014/08]
Entry into regional phase22.10.2013National basic fee paid 
22.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/08]
16.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination21.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0753/16
22.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XDI]US2007288296  (LEWIS GRAHAM [GB]) [XD] 1-5,8-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0012] - [0021] - [0024] - [0027] - [0028] - [0033] , [0036] - [0046] - [0053] * [I] 1-12;
 [XI]US2005203790  (COHEN ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0031] , [0032] , [0040] , [0043] , [0047] - [0055] - [0056] , [0080] , [0109] , [0112] , [0117] - [0121] * [I] 1-12;
 [I]DE102005021432  (KROGER CO [US]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0018] , [0024] , [0031] - [0035] - [0047] , [0051] , [0054] - [0059] - [0064] , [0065] *;
 [A]US2003171979  (JENKINS MARGALYN TOI [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0008] , [0033] - [0048] - [0065] - [0069] *
by applicantUS2007288296