Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2694016 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2694016



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2344
03.07.2024 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
03.07.2024 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
03.07.2024 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
27.06.2024 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
28.03.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 32
28.03.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 32
28.03.2024 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.03.2024 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 26
28.03.2024 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
28.03.2024 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2024 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.03.2024 Means of redress Opposition 2
09.11.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
09.11.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
09.11.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
09.11.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
25.08.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.08.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.08.2023 Amended description with annotations Opposition 6
22.08.2023 Description Opposition 6
22.08.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.08.2023 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.06.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.06.2023 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 2
13.06.2023 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
06.06.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.06.2023 Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative Opposition 1
19.04.2023 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
19.04.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
19.04.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
19.04.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
19.04.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
10.02.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 21
10.02.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
10.02.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
20.01.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
20.01.2023 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
22.12.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.12.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.12.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.12.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.12.2022 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
16.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.12.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
23.09.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 13
23.09.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 13
20.04.2022 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 3
11.04.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
11.04.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
06.04.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.09.2021 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.01.2021 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
21.01.2021 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
21.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.07.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.07.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 15 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 16 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 17 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 18 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 19 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 20 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 21 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 22 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 23 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 24 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 25 Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
27.07.2020 Reply to appeal Appeal 38
17.03.2020 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.03.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.03.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.03.2020 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
13.01.2020 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
20.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.12.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.12.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.11.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.11.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.10.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.10.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.10.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
28.10.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.10.2019 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
28.10.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
28.10.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.10.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.10.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
28.10.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.10.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.09.2019 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 130
06.09.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.09.2019 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 4
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 4
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Claims Opposition 3
04.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.09.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
06.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.07.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
22.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 90
12.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Claims Opposition 3
12.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.07.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 13
10.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.07.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.07.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
09.07.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
03.07.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 94
01.07.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 101
14.06.2019 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
11.02.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
14.01.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
14.01.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2019 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.11.2018 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
20.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.11.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
16.11.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.11.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.11.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.07.2018 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 18
13.03.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.03.2018 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.03.2018 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
22.02.2018 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 118
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 118
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
22.02.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
24.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
28.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.02.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
16.02.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.12.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
16.11.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 129
11.11.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
04.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.11.2016 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
04.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
04.11.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 66
04.11.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 37
04.11.2016 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 16
10.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
10.10.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 32
21.07.2016 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
11.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.07.2016 Request for further processing Search / examination 5
16.03.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
09.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.03.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.12.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
02.11.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
02.11.2015 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
28.10.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
27.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
23.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
23.10.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.08.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.08.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
13.08.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.08.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
06.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.05.2014 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
27.05.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
15.01.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.12.2013 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
11.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
19.08.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.01.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
17.01.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
26.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 1
26.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
26.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2
01.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
11.10.2012 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 32
19.04.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.04.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 2
19.04.2012 Description International Searching Authority 29
19.04.2012 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 1