Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2694715

EP2694715 - SHEET OF VEGETABLE WOOL FIBRE IMPREGNATED WITH AN EPOXIDISED VEGETABLE OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.04.2017  [2017/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universite Montpellier 2, Sciences ET Techniques (Etablissement Public)
Place Eugène Bataillon
34095 Montpellier / FR
For all designated states
Université Montpellier I
5, Boulevard Henri IV
F-34000 Montpellier / FR
For all designated states
Ecole Nationale Superieure De Chimie Montpellier (ENSC)
8 rue de l'Ecole Normale
34000 Montpellier / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]For all designated states
Universite Montpellier 2, Sciences ET Techniques (Etablissement Public)
Place Eugène Bataillon
34095 Montpellier / FR
For all designated states
Université Montpellier I
5, Boulevard Henri IV
F-34000 Montpellier / FR
For all designated states
Ecole Nationale Superieure De Chimie Montpellier (ENSC)
8 rue de l'Ecole Normale
34000 Montpellier / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / HABAS, Jean-Pierre
30 allée du Chêne Vert
F-34000 Montpellier / FR
02 / STEMMELEN, Mylène
119 Rue de Javel
F-75015 Paris / FR
03 / LAPINTE, Vincent
46 Rue des Amandiers
F-34160 Castries / FR
04 / CAILLOL, Sylvain
Résidence Europa-Espagne -
412 Avenue Père Soulas
F-34090 Montpellier / FR
05 / BOUTEVIN, Bernard
Les Terres Blanches -
1 Rue Anselme Mathieu
F-34090 Montpellier / FR
06 / RICBOURG, Maxime
472 Route Nationale
F-59930 La Chapelle D'armentieres / FR
 [2014/21]
Former [2014/07]01 / HABAS, Jean-Pierre
18 Rue Edouard Branly, Appt 118
F-34790 Grabels / FR
02 / STEMMELEN, Mylène
119 Rue de Javel
F-75015 Paris / FR
03 / LAPINTE, Vincent
46 Rue des Amandiers
F-34160 Castries / FR
04 / CAILLOL, Sylvain
Résidence Europa-Espagne -
412 Avenue Père Soulas
F-34090 Montpellier / FR
05 / BOUTEVIN, Bernard
Les Terres Blanches -
1 Rue Anselme Mathieu
F-34090 Montpellier / FR
06 / RICBOURG, Maxime
472 Route Nationale
F-59930 La Chapelle D'armentieres / FR
Representative(s)IPAZ
Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon
CS 70003 Saint-Aubin
91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]Pontet Allano & Associes
Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon
CS 70003 Saint Aubin
91192 Gif sur Yvette Cedex / FR
Former [2014/07]Rhein, Alain
CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN
17, rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Application number, filing date12720250.505.04.2012
WO2012FR50744
Priority number, dateFR2011005296706.04.2011         Original published format: FR 1152967
FR2011005426417.05.2011         Original published format: FR 1154264
[2014/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012136940
Date:11.10.2012
Language:FR
[2012/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2694715
Date:12.02.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012
[2014/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/64
[2014/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
TitleGerman:VLIES AUS PFLANZENWOLLFASER MIT EINER IMPRÄGNIERUNG AUS EPOXIDIERTEM PFLANZENÖL[2014/07]
English:SHEET OF VEGETABLE WOOL FIBRE IMPREGNATED WITH AN EPOXIDISED VEGETABLE OIL[2014/07]
French:NAPPE DE FIBRE DE LAINE VEGETALE IMPREGNEE D'UNE HUILE VEGETALE EPOXYDEE[2014/07]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2013National basic fee paid 
05.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
14.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/15]
29.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0132755  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 34 * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 9; claims 1-25 *
by applicantFR2626597
 FR2731243
 FR2924719