blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2680928 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2680928



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 519
03.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
08.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.06.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.06.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.06.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.06.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
14.06.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
30.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
30.05.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.05.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.05.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
24.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.05.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 11
24.05.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2018 Description Search / examination 10
24.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.05.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.05.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.05.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
04.05.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
04.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 6
02.02.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
22.01.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.01.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
02.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
02.06.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
02.06.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
02.06.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
23.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.04.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
23.03.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 41
01.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.06.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
23.06.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
23.06.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
20.06.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
20.06.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
20.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.06.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
15.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.04.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.04.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.09.2015 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
05.05.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
05.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.04.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
15.04.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
15.04.2014 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
15.04.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
15.04.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
10.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.04.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
10.04.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
10.04.2014 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
10.04.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
10.04.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.10.2013 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
09.10.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
24.09.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
23.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
17.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.09.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
17.07.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.10.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
13.09.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.09.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
24.07.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
24.07.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.07.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
14.05.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
14.05.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 4
14.05.2012 Description International Searching Authority 12
14.05.2012 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
14.05.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 13