Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2710321

EP2710321 - MANUALLY ACTUATABLE OR AUTOMATIC FIREARM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.02.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH
Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2
29345 Unterlüss / DE
[2014/13]
Inventor(s)01 / HERRMANN, Ralf-Joachim
Finkenstraße 1a
15712 Königs Wusterhausen / DE
02 / SCHMEES, Heiner
Kreuzgarten 44
29223 Celle / DE
 [2014/13]
Representative(s)Dietrich, Barbara
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/13]
Application number, filing date12721255.310.05.2012
WO2012EP58619
Priority number, dateDE20111010165316.05.2011         Original published format: DE102011101653
[2014/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012156266
Date:22.11.2012
Language:DE
[2012/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2710321
Date:26.03.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012
[2014/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:F41A3/90, F41A25/02, F41A25/12
[2014/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/13]
TitleGerman:HANDBETÄTIGBARE ODER AUTOMATISCHE SCHUSSWAFFE[2014/13]
English:MANUALLY ACTUATABLE OR AUTOMATIC FIREARM[2014/13]
French:ARME À FEU À COMMANDE MANUELLE OU AUTOMATIQUE[2014/13]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2013National basic fee paid 
24.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/13]
02.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination12.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0588/17
03.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4388855  (SOKOLOVSKY PAUL J [US]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 22 *;
 [Y]DE2300909  (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG) [Y] 1-5 * figure - * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph l *;
 [A]US2877690  (BARR IRWIN R, et al) [A] 1,5 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 9 - line 53 *;
 [A]US4957033  (RELANGE DOMINIQUE [FR]) [A] 2-4 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 27 - line 42 *;
 [A]CH71069  (BRAEM JEAN [CH]) [A] 1 * figure 4; claim . *
by applicantDE3133144
    - RHEINMETALL, Waffen technisches Taschenbuch, (1985), page 266 FF