Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2694789

EP2694789 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HOT WATER AND/OR STEAM AND FOR STORING WATER IN LIQUID AND/OR GASEOUS FORM FOR USE FOR A GAS TURBINE POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technische Universität Chemnitz
Strasse der Nationen 62
09111 Chemnitz / DE
[2014/07]
Inventor(s)01 / URBANECK, Thorsten
Pfarrhübel 1
09125 Chemnitz / DE
02 / PLATZER, Bernd
Bergstr. 25
09235 Burkhardtsdorf/Neuei. / DE
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)Rumrich, Gabriele
Patentanwältin
Limbacher Strasse 305
09116 Chemnitz / DE
[2018/17]
Former [2014/07]Rumrich, Gabriele
Patentanwältin Limbacher Strasse 305
09116 Chemnitz / DE
Application number, filing date12721729.728.03.2012
[2018/17]
WO2012DE100080
Priority number, dateDE2011100176604.04.2011         Original published format: DE102011001766
[2014/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012136201
Date:11.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2694789
Date:12.02.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012
[2014/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2694789
Date:25.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:F22B1/00, F02C6/18, F02C1/05, F02C1/06, F01K3/18, F01K21/04, F02C1/00
[2017/01]
Former International [2014/07]F02C1/00, F02C1/05, F02C1/06, F01K3/18, F01K21/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON HEISSWASSER UND/ODER DAMPF UND FÜR DIE SPEICHERUNG VON WASSER IN FLÜSSIGER UND/ODER GASFÖRMIGER FORM ZUM EINSATZ FÜR EIN GASTURBINENKRAFTWERK[2014/07]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HOT WATER AND/OR STEAM AND FOR STORING WATER IN LIQUID AND/OR GASEOUS FORM FOR USE FOR A GAS TURBINE POWER PLANT[2014/07]
French:INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'EAU CHAUDE ET/OU DE VAPEUR ET DE STOCKAGE D'EAU SOUS FORME LIQUIDE ET/OU GAZEUSE, DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UNE CENTRALE À TURBINES À GAZ[2014/07]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2013National basic fee paid 
25.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
04.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2018Fee for grant paid
13.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2017
Opposition(s)28.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
09.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/26]CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/12]CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/03]FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
Former [2018/51]FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/50]FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/49]FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/47]FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL25.04.2018