Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2695111

EP2695111 - ENERGY SERVICES INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.01.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
21.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spirae, Inc.
320 E Vine Street, Ste 307
Ft. Collins, CO 80524 / US
[2014/07]
Inventor(s)01 / SUNIL, Cherian
320 E. Vine Drive
Suite 307
Fort Collins, CO 80524-4438 / US
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date12721971.521.02.2012
WO2012US25943
Priority number, dateUS201161444987P21.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161444987 P
US20121340053820.02.2012         Original published format: US201213400538
[2014/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012115966
Date:30.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2695111
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012
[2014/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.02.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, G06F19/00
[2014/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
TitleGerman:ENERGIEDIENSTSCHNITTSTELLE[2014/07]
English:ENERGY SERVICES INTERFACE[2014/07]
French:INTERFACE POUR SERVICES ÉNERGÉTIQUES[2014/07]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2013National basic fee paid 
04.11.2013Search fee paid 
30.08.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/07]
30.08.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
04.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2014/07]
16.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2016
08.06.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
17.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination25.07.2016Appeal received No.  T0052/17
21.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
04.11.2013Request for further processing filed
04.11.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.11.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
09.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
19.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201908   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2019
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US2010217550  (CRABTREE ET AL.);
 [Y]US2010320837  (HARRISON);
 [Y]US6473744  (TUCK ET AL.);
 [Y]US2011025556  (BRIDGES ET AL.);
 [A]US2006195229  (BELLET AL.);
 [A]US2010292857  (BOSE ET AL.);
 [A]US2007038335  (MCINTYRE ET AL.);
 [A]US2010179704  (OZOG)