EP2847273 - THERMOPLASTIC POLYMER COMPOSITION AND MOULDED PARTS MADE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DULLAERT, Konraad Albert Louise Hector P.O. Box 4 NL-6100 AA Echt / NL | 02 /
WANG, Zhujuan P.O. Box 4 NL-6100 AA Echt / NL | 03 /
SOUR, Wilhelmus Josephus Maria P.O. Box 4 NL-6100 AA Echt / NL | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Pacifico, Jessica, et al DSM Intellectual Property Urmond Office P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 12722099.4 | 07.05.2012 | WO2012EP58390 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013167166 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2847273 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/02, C08K3/00 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
C08J5/00 (KR);
C08K3/00 (KR);
C08L77/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L77/02 (EP,US);
C08L81/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08L81/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/014 (EP,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,US);
C08K3/16 (EP,US);
C08K7/14 (EP,US);
C08L2201/08 (CN);
C08L2203/18 (CN);
C08L2205/035 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L77/02, C08K3/014, C08L77/00, C08L81/04 (EP,US);
C08L81/02, C08L77/06, C08L77/02, C08L23/06, C08K13/04, C08K7/14, C08K2003/0856, C08K3/16 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMTEILE DARAUS | [2015/12] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC POLYMER COMPOSITION AND MOULDED PARTS MADE THEREOF | [2015/12] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYMÈRE THERMOPLASTIQUE ET PIÈCES MOULÉES FABRIQUÉES À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 14.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 16.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2009275683 (LEE EUN-JOO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [Y]EP1498445 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0018]; claim 1 * | Examination | US2010331463 | EP1681313 | by applicant | WO2006074934 | EP1498445 | WO2010076145 | WO2010014801 |