Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2709515

EP2709515 - DEVICE FOR VISUALIZATION AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL RECONSTRUCTION IN ENDOSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.05.2018  [2018/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université Libre de Bruxelles
Avenue Franklin Roosevelt, 50
CP 161
1050 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/13]For all designated states
Université Libre de Bruxelles
Avenue F. D. Roosevelt
C.P. 161
1050 Bruxelles / BE
Inventor(s)01 / MERTENS, Benjamin
rue Klipveld 48
B-1180 Uccle / BE
02 / KOCKAERT, Pascal
Chaussée Saint-Pierre 19
B-1040 Etterbeek / BE
 [2014/13]
Representative(s)De Groote, Christophe , et al
Abyoo sprl
Centre Monnet
Avenue Jean Monnet, 1
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/13]Denis, Samuel , et al
Pecher & de Groote sprl
Centre Monnet
Avenue Jean Monnet, 1
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
Application number, filing date12723147.015.05.2012
WO2012EP59023
Priority number, dateEP2011016618016.05.2011         Original published format: EP 11166180
[2014/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012156402
Date:22.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2709515
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012
[2014/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/07
[2014/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/13]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE VISUALISIERUNG UND DREIDIMENSIONALE REKONSTRUKTION IN DER ENDOSKOPIE[2014/13]
English:DEVICE FOR VISUALIZATION AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL RECONSTRUCTION IN ENDOSCOPY[2014/13]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR VISUALISATION ET RECONSTRUCTION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE EN ENDOSCOPIE[2014/13]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2013National basic fee paid 
09.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/13]
01.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/19]
04.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010149315  (QU JIANAN [CN], et al) [A] 1,16 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061]; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2653657  (CROISY RENAUD, et al) [A] 1,16 * abstract *
by applicantUS2007197862
 US2010149315
 CN201429412Y
 US2008240502
    SALVI ET AL., "A state of the art in structured light patterns for surface profilometry", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (2010), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/j.patcog.2010.03.004, pages 2666 - 2680, XP055146133

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2010.03.004
    C. FROEHLY; B. COLOMBEAU; M. VAMPOUILLE, "Shaping and Analysis of picoseconds light pulses", PROGRESS IN OPTICS XX, (1983), page 79,
    B CHOMYCZ, Fiber optic installer's field manual, MC GRAW-HIL,
    T. A. BIRKS; J. C. KNIGHT; P. ST. J. RUSSELL, "Endlessly single-mode photonic crystal fiber", OPTICS LETTERS, (19970701), vol. 22, no. 13, XP000658692
    T T W J Y QU, "Optical imaging for medical diagnosis based on active stereo vision and motion tracking", OPT. EXPRESS, (2007), vol. 15, pages 10421 - 10426,
    G BRADSKY, Learning OpenCV, O'REILLY,
    T.L. ALEXANDER ET AL., "Average speckle size as a function of intensity threshold level: comparison of experimental measurements with theory", APPLIED OPTICS, (1994), vol. 33, no. 35, page 8240,
    ALEXANDER ET AL., "Average speckle size as a function of intensity threshold level: comparison of experimental measurements with theory", APPLIED OPTICS, (1994), vol. 33, no. 35, page 8240,