Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014071238 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11166180 | 16.05.2011 | WO2012EP59023 | 15.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014518710 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11166180 | 16.05.2011 | WO2012EP59023 | 15.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2709515 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12723147 | 15.05.2012 | EP11166180 | 16.05.2011 | WO2012EP59023 | 15.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012156402 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11166180 | 16.05.2011 |