Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2714825

EP2714825 - POLYMER-BONDED QUATERRYLENE AND/OR TERRYLENE DYES AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SICPA HOLDING SA
Avenue de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
[2014/15]
Inventor(s)01 / TILLER, Thomas
Chemin du Cèdre 21
CH-1030 Bussigny / CH
02 / COMMEUREUC, Aurélien
Ruelle de la Riettaz 1
1123 Aclens / CH
03 / PASQUIER, Cécile
Impasse des Primevères 1
CH-1723 Marly / CH
 [2014/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/15]Dossmann, Gérard
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date12723212.225.05.2012
[2015/48]
WO2012EP59795
Priority number, dateEP2011016752225.05.2011         Original published format: EP 11167522
US201161489891P25.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161489891 P
[2014/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012160182
Date:29.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2714825
Date:09.04.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012
[2014/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2714825
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/328, C09D11/037
[2015/24]
Former International [2014/15]C09D11/00, C09D11/02, B41M3/14, B42D15/00, C09B5/02, C09B69/10, C07D311/00, C07D471/00, C07D221/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMERGEBUNDENE QUATERRYLEN-UND/ODER TERRYLEN-FARBSTOFFE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT[2014/15]
English:POLYMER-BONDED QUATERRYLENE AND/OR TERRYLENE DYES AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME[2014/15]
French:COLORANTS QUATERRYLÈNE ET/OU TERRYLÈNE RELIÉS À UN POLYMÈRE ET COMPOSITIONS LES CONTENANT[2014/15]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2013National basic fee paid 
19.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/15]
18.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2015Fee for grant paid
07.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2015
Opposition(s)26.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.05.2012
AL25.11.2015
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE25.05.2016
LU25.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU25.05.2012
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE25.05.2016
LU25.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/31]HU25.05.2012
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE25.05.2016
LU25.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/29]HU25.05.2012
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE25.05.2016
LU25.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU25.05.2012
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE25.05.2016
LU25.05.2016
Former [2017/38]AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE25.05.2016
LU25.05.2016
Former [2017/04]AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
LU25.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/25]AT25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]US2002182422  (GARRETT PAUL D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * example - *;
 [A]US2008245411  (HAMMERMANN MARKUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * example - *;
 [A]DE102008036495  (LANGHALS HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-20 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]US2006058330  (KRIEGER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * example - *;
 [A]US2004194665  (KONEMANN MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]US2009056793  (LANGHALS HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * example -; claim - *