Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2710069

EP2710069 - FILMS OF STARCH-POLYMER-WAX-OIL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.04.2016
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.05.2016  [2016/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/13]
Inventor(s)01 / ALLEN, William, Maxwell, Jr.
5612 Safari Drive
Liberty Township, Ohio 45044 / US
02 / BOND, Eric, Bryan
253 Terwilligers Run
Maineville, Ohio 45039 / US
03 / NODA, Isao
1568 Hunter Road
Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US
 [2014/13]
Representative(s)Goodier, Claire-Louise , et al
N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[2014/13]
Application number, filing date12723808.718.05.2012
WO2012US38539
Priority number, dateUS201161488580P20.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161488580 P
[2014/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012162136
Date:29.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2710069
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012
[2014/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08K11/00
[2014/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/13]
TitleGerman:FILME AUS STÄRKE-POLYMER-WACHS-ÖL-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2014/13]
English:FILMS OF STARCH-POLYMER-WAX-OIL COMPOSITIONS[2014/13]
French:FILMS FORMÉS À PARTIR DE COMPOSITIONS AMIDON/POLYMÈRES/CIRES/HUILES[2014/13]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2013National basic fee paid 
29.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/13]
24.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/19]
08.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US7402618  (XU HAO [CN]) [X] 10 * claim 1 * [Y] 10;
 [Y]US6231970  (ANDERSEN PER JUST [US], et al) [Y] 10 * column 35, line 5 - column 35, line 10 *
by applicantUS3093612
 US5280055
 US5314934
 US5362777
 US5844023
 US6214907
 US6242102
 US6096809
 US6218321
 US6235815
 US6235816
 US6231970
 USRE36548E
 US5990271
 US3929678
 US4259217
 EP0414549
 WO9308876
 WO9308874
 US7588706
 US6653523
 US7851391
 US6783854
 US6818295
 US4152387
 US4197069
 US4533308
 US4609518
 US4629643
 US4637819
 US4681793
 US4695422
 US4778644
 US4839216
 US4846821
 US4463045
 US4798604
 US4780352
 US3566726
    - J. APPLY. POLYM. SCI, (2001), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 169 - 177
    - J. APPLY. POLYM. SCI, (2007), vol. 105, no. 4, pages 2000 - 2007
    - JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 108, no. 1-2, pages 25 - 36
    - Modem Plastics Encyclopedia Handbook, (1994), page 236