EP2710069 - FILMS OF STARCH-POLYMER-WAX-OIL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, William, Maxwell, Jr. 5612 Safari Drive Liberty Township, Ohio 45044 / US | 02 /
BOND, Eric, Bryan 253 Terwilligers Run Maineville, Ohio 45039 / US | 03 /
NODA, Isao 1568 Hunter Road Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 12723808.7 | 18.05.2012 | WO2012US38539 | Priority number, date | US201161488580P | 20.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161488580 P | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012162136 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2710069 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08K11/00 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
C08K11/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | FILME AUS STÄRKE-POLYMER-WACHS-ÖL-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2014/13] | English: | FILMS OF STARCH-POLYMER-WAX-OIL COMPOSITIONS | [2014/13] | French: | FILMS FORMÉS À PARTIR DE COMPOSITIONS AMIDON/POLYMÈRES/CIRES/HUILES | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/19] | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US7402618 (XU HAO [CN]) [X] 10 * claim 1 * [Y] 10; | [Y]US6231970 (ANDERSEN PER JUST [US], et al) [Y] 10 * column 35, line 5 - column 35, line 10 * | by applicant | US3093612 | US5280055 | US5314934 | US5362777 | US5844023 | US6214907 | US6242102 | US6096809 | US6218321 | US6235815 | US6235816 | US6231970 | USRE36548E | US5990271 | US3929678 | US4259217 | EP0414549 | WO9308876 | WO9308874 | US7588706 | US6653523 | US7851391 | US6783854 | US6818295 | US4152387 | US4197069 | US4533308 | US4609518 | US4629643 | US4637819 | US4681793 | US4695422 | US4778644 | US4839216 | US4846821 | US4463045 | US4798604 | US4780352 | US3566726 | - J. APPLY. POLYM. SCI, (2001), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 169 - 177 | - J. APPLY. POLYM. SCI, (2007), vol. 105, no. 4, pages 2000 - 2007 | - JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 108, no. 1-2, pages 25 - 36 | - Modem Plastics Encyclopedia Handbook, (1994), page 236 |