EP2803182 - METHOD FOR PERFORMING DNS RESOLUTION IN A NETWORK, CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND CLIENT TERMINAL FOR DEPLOYMENT IN A CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Europe Ltd. Kurfürsten-Anlage 36 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEDORF, Jan Breslauer Strasse 53 69124 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
ARUMAITHURAI, Mayutan Danziger Strasse 20 37083 Göttingen / DE | [2015/09] |
Former [2014/47] | 01 /
SEEDORF, Jan Breslauer Strasse 53 69124 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02 /
ARUMAITHURAI, Mayutan Hauptstrasse 50 69221 Dossenheim / DE | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Ullrich & Naumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12723842.6 | 30.04.2012 | WO2012EP57899 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013164007 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2803182 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
H04L61/4511 (EP,CN,US);
H04L61/106 (US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/1021 (EP,CN,US);
H04L2101/69 (EP,CN,US);
H04L61/58 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER DNS-AUFLÖSUNG IN EINEM NETZWERK, INHALTSVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM UND CLIENT-ENDGERÄT ZUR ANWENDUNG IN EINEM INHALTSVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2014/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PERFORMING DNS RESOLUTION IN A NETWORK, CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND CLIENT TERMINAL FOR DEPLOYMENT IN A CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [2014/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR EFFECTUER UNE RÉSOLUTION DNS DANS UN RÉSEAU, SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU ET TERMINAL CLIENT POUR DÉPLOIEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU | [2014/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 01.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY] - PENNO J MEDVED JUNIPER NETWORKS R ALIMI GOOGLE R YANG YALE UNIVERSITY S PREVIDI CISCO SYSTEMS R, "ALTO and Content Delivery Networks; draft-penno-alto-cdn-03.txt", ALTO AND CONTENT DELIVERY NETWORKS; DRAFT-PENNO-ALTO-CDN-03.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20110314), no. 3, pages 1 - 27, XP015074898 [X] 1,2,5,16-21,24 * Chapters 1-6. * [Y] 3 | [Y] - Sam Dunn, "Add a Mobile Landing Page to Your Site", Build Interne, (20110126), pages 1 - 21, URL: http://buildinternet.com/2011/01/add-a-mobile-landing-page-to-your-site/, (20130116), XP055049944 [Y] 3 * the whole document * | [A] - CONTAVALLI W VAN DER GAAST GOOGLE S LEACH VERISIGN E LEWIS NEUSTAR C, "Client subnet in DNS requests; draft-vandergaast-edns-client-subnet-01.txt", CLIENT SUBNET IN DNS REQUESTS; DRAFT-VANDERGAAST-EDNS-CLIENT-SUBNET-01.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20120425), pages 1 - 32, XP015082585 [A] 1-3,5,16-21,24 * Chapters 3 and 4. * | by applicant | - C. CONTAVALLI; W. VAN DER GAAST; S. LEACH; D. RODDEN, CLIENT SUBNET IN DNS REQUESTS, (201107), URL: draft-vandergaast-edns-client-subnet-00 |