Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789141

EP2789141 - INITIALIZING REFERENCE SIGNAL GENERATION IN WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / FRENNE, Mattias
Arkeologvägen 20
S-754 43 Uppsala / SE
02 / KOORAPATY, Havish
13425 Kodiac Place
Saratoga 95070 / US
03 / CHENG, Jung-Fu
1806 Mandan Place
Fremont CA 94539 / US
04 / LARSSON, Daniel
Hasseluddsvägen 26
S-18653 Vallentuna / SE
05 / JÖNGREN, George
Kronogårdsvägen 44
S-174 62 Sundbyberg / SE
 [2014/43]
Former [2014/42]01 / FRENNE, Mattias
Arkeologvägen 20
S-754 43 Uppsala / SE
02 / KOORAPATY, Havish
13425 Kodiac Place
Saratoga 95070 / US
03 / CHENG, Jung-Fu
1806 Mandan Place
Fremont CA 94539 / US
04 / LARSSON, Daniel
Birger Jarlsgatan 113 C
S-18653 Vallentuna / SE
05 / JÖNGREN, George
Kronogårdsvägen 44
S-174 62 Sundbyberg / SE
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12723963.011.05.2012
WO2012SE50502
Priority number, dateUS201161568933P09.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161568933 P
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013085451
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789141
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/02, H04L5/00
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:BEGINN EINER REFERENZSIGNALERZEUGUNG IN DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKEN[2014/42]
English:INITIALIZING REFERENCE SIGNAL GENERATION IN WIRELESS NETWORKS[2014/42]
French:INITIALISATION DE LA GÉNÉRATION D'UN SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DANS DES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2014National basic fee paid 
16.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
22.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/40]
30.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - RESEARCH IN MOTION ET AL, "Design Consideration for E-PDCCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-113236(RIM-E-PDCCH DESIGN), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050538352 [X] 1,8,20,27 * section 2.1 *;; figure 1 * [I] 2-7,9-19,21-26,28-38
 [XI]  - SAMSUNG, "DM-RS based Distributed and Localized E-PDCCH structure", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-114239 DM-RS BASED E-PDCCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111108), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050562163 [X] 1,8,20,27 * sections 2 and 3 * [I] 2-7,9-19,21-26,28-38
 [XI]  - RESEARCH IN MOTION ET AL, "E-PDCCH Transmission with DMRS as Demodulation RS", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-113958 (RIM - REFERENCE SIGNALS FOR EPDCCH)-FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111108), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050562007 [X] 1,8,20,27 * section 2 * [I] 2-7,9-19,21-26,28-38
 [XI]  - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS ET AL, "Consideration on Reference Signal for E-PDCCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-113932, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111109), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050562280 [X] 1,8,20,27 * section 2 * [I] 2-7,9-19,21-26,28-38
 [XI]  - SAMSUNG, "Discussion on ePDCCH Design Issues", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-112517 EPDCCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110816), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20110822, XP050537597 [X] 1,8,20,27 * page 3, paragraphs 1-4 * [I] 2-7,9-19,21-26,28-38
 [XI]  - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "Reference signals for E-PDCCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-113899, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111108), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050561978 [X] 1,8,20,27 * section 3 * [I] 2-7,9-19,21-26,28-38