Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2856281

EP2856281 - CONTENT/ADVERTISING PROFILING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2018Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
17.07.2018New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BHAMIDIPATI, Sandilya
2250 Latham Street
Apt 62
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
02 / FAWAZ, Nadia
1531 Bellomy Street
Santa Clara, California 95050 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]01 / BHAMIDIPATI, Sandilya
2250 Latham Street
Apt 62
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
02 / FAWAZ, Nadia
1063 Morse Avenue
Apt. 24-306
Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
12 place des Halles Saint Louis
56100 Lorient / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12724271.724.05.2012
WO2012US39272
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013176671
Date:28.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2856281
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, G06Q30/02
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
TitleGerman:INHALTS-/WERBUNGS-PROFILIERUNG[2015/15]
English:CONTENT/ADVERTISING PROFILING[2015/15]
French:PROFILAGE PUBLICITAIRE/DE CONTENU[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2014National basic fee paid 
18.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
13.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/19]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2001049620  (BLASKO JOHN P [US]) [X] 1,3,8,9,12 * figures 1,2,6,7 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0053] , [0060] - [0063] - [0067] , [0068] , [0073] , [0087] , [0109] * [Y] 4-7,10,11 [I] 2;
 [XAY]US2006200432  (FLINN STEVEN D [US] ET AL FLINN STEVEN DENNIS [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,8,9,12 * figures 1-3,7 * * paragraphs [0075] , [0076] , [0113] , [0117] - [0119] - [0123] * [A] 7,11 [Y] 3-6,10;
 [IAY]US2002133490  (CONKWRIGHT G COLBY [US] ET AL) [I] 1,9,12 * figures 1,3,11,19 * * paragraphs [0064] , [0076] , [0079] , [0081] , [0099] , [0272] - [0275] * [A] 6,7,11 [Y] 4,5,10;
 [YA]US2010211439  (MARCI CARL D [US] ET AL) [Y] 3-5,10 * figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0062] , [0083] , [0112] , [0119] * [A] 1,7,11;
 [YA]US2004013398  (MIURA MASATOSHI KIMURA [JP] ET AL MIURA MASATOSHI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 4-7,10,11 * figures 1,10,17 * * paragraphs [0094] , [0095] , [0104] , [0189] , [0248] * [A] 1;
 [YA]US2009195392  (ZALEWSKI GARY [US]) [Y] 4-6,10 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0024] , [0031] * [A] 1