Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812503

EP2812503 - SYSTEM FOR ATTACHING A PANEL TO A BEARING STRUCTURE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Techniwood International
Tour Panoramique
54320 Maxéville / FR
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / BOURDON, Laurent
51 allée Sochein Vieugy
F-74600 Seynod / FR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
2 allée de la Forêt de la Reine
54500 Vandoeuvre-lès-Nancy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/05]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
L'Escurial - Technopole Nancy Brabois
17 avenue de la Forêt de Haye
54500 Vandoeuvre-les-Nancy / FR
Former [2014/51]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
L'Escurial - Technolpole Nancy Brabois
17, Avenue de la Forêt de Haye
54519 Vandoeuvre les Nancy Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12725477.916.04.2012
[2017/05]
WO2012FR50830
Priority number, dateFR2012005111807.02.2012         Original published format: FR 1251118
[2014/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013117825
Date:15.08.2013
Language:FR
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812503
Date:17.12.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812503
Date:01.02.2017
Language:FR
[2017/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:E04B2/90, E04F13/23, E04F13/28, // E04B1/10, E04B1/38
[2016/50]
Former International [2014/51]E04B1/38, E04B2/90, E04B1/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER PLATTE AN EINEM TRAGESTRUKTURELEMENT[2014/51]
English:SYSTEM FOR ATTACHING A PANEL TO A BEARING STRUCTURE ELEMENT[2014/51]
French:SYSTÈME DE FIXATION D'UN PANNEAU SUR UN ÉLÉMENT DE STRUCTURE PORTEUSE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
21.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2016Fee for grant paid
13.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.08.2015
Opposition(s)03.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
08.09.201403   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.2014
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.04.2012
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
MK01.02.2017
MT01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE16.04.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU16.04.2012
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
MT01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE16.04.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2019/31]HU16.04.2012
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
MT01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE16.04.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
MT01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE16.04.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
IE16.04.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/06]CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]FR2940376  (WOOD WINNER [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 17 - page 12, line 10; figures 1-4 * [I] 7-12;
 [A]WO2007031240  (SCHUECO INT KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3436491  (BWM DUEBEL & MONTAGETECH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4765108  (LAPISH ERNEST B [NZ]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantFR2922565