Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2718770

EP2718770 - DEVICE FOR POSITIONING A THREADED CROWN OF A TIMEPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/16]DEVICE FOR ORIENTATING A SCREWED ELEMENT OF A TIMEPIECE
[2016/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Omega SA
Rue Stämpfli 96
2500 Biel/ Bienne 4 / CH
[2017/02]
Former [2014/16]For all designated states
Omega SA
Rue Stämpfli 96
2500 Biel/ Bienne 4 / CH
Inventor(s)01 / KNUCHEL, Daniel
General-Dufour-Strasse 158
CH-2502 Biel / CH
02 / BRISWALTER, Sébastien
7, rue du Sundgau
F-68480 Pfetterhouse / FR
 [2017/02]
Former [2014/16]01 / KNUCHEL, Daniel
General-Dufour-Strasse 158
CH-2502 Biel / CH
02 / BRISWALTER, Sébastien
7 rue du Sundgau
F-68480 Pfetterhouse / FR
Representative(s)Goulette, Ludivine , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[2017/02]
Former [2014/16]Gilligmann, Benoît Philippe , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date12725773.105.06.2012
[2017/02]
WO2012EP60602
Priority number, dateEP2011016905208.06.2011         Original published format: EP 11169052
[2014/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012168243
Date:13.12.2012
Language:FR
[2012/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2718770
Date:16.04.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012
[2014/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2718770
Date:11.01.2017
Language:FR
[2017/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:G04B3/04, G04B37/10
[2014/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSRICHTUNG DER GESCHRAUBTEN AUFZUGSKRONE EINER UHR[2016/37]
English:DEVICE FOR POSITIONING A THREADED CROWN OF A TIMEPIECE[2016/37]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR L'ORIENTATION D'UNE COURONNE VISSEE D'UNE PIECE D'HORLOGERIE[2016/37]
Former [2014/16]VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSRICHTEN EINES SCHRAUBENELEMENTS EINER UHR
Former [2014/16]DEVICE FOR ORIENTATING A SCREWED ELEMENT OF A TIMEPIECE
Former [2014/16]DISPOSITIF POUR L'ORIENTATION D'UN ELEMENT VISSE D'UNE PIECE D'HORLOGERIE
Entry into regional phase08.01.2014National basic fee paid 
08.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/16]
17.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2016Fee for grant paid
30.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2016
Opposition(s)12.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
IT11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
MT11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
IE05.06.2017
LU05.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
IT11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
IE05.06.2017
LU05.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
IT11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
IE05.06.2017
LU05.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
IT11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
LU05.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
IT11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2018/11]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
IT11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
IT11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
IT11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
IT11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US5923622  (CHUNG SHENG-KUN [TW]) [X] 1-2 * the whole document *;
 [DY]EP1701225  (BONINCHI SA [CH]) [DY] 1-4,10-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 7] , [0 14] , [0 17] , [0 20] , [0 22]; figures 2, 3 *;
 [DY]EP1411401  (KS 22 SA [CH]) [DY] 1,4,10-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] *;
 [PY]EP2385432  (ROLEX SA [CH]) [PY] 2-3 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2182417  (PIBOR ISO S A [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP1124167
 EP1701225
 EP1411401