Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2734562

EP2734562 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POLYURETHANE POLYUREAS CONTAINING SIDE CHAINS AND OF AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF THESE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stahl International B.V.
Sluisweg 10
5145 PE Waalwijk / NL
[2014/34]
Former [2014/22]For all designated states
Clariant International Ltd.
Rothausstrasse 61
4132 Muttenz 1 / CH
Inventor(s)01 / MÜNTER, Jürgen
Reiherweg 7
71336 Waiblingen-Neustadt / DE
 [2014/23]
Former [2014/22]01 / MÜNTER, Jürgen
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 54
70736 Fellbach / DE
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/12]
Former [2014/26]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2014/22]Mikulecky, Klaus , et al
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent & License Management Chemicals
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date12726354.922.05.2012
[2017/12]
WO2012EP02163
Priority number, dateDE20111010787319.07.2011         Original published format: DE102011107873
[2014/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013010606
Date:24.01.2013
Language:DE
[2013/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2734562
Date:28.05.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013
[2014/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2734562
Date:22.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/08, C08G18/38, C08G71/04, C14C11/00
[2014/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SEITENKETTEN ENTHALTENDEN POLYURETHAN-POLYHARNSTOFFEN UND DEREN WÄSSRIGEN DISPERSIONEN[2014/22]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POLYURETHANE POLYUREAS CONTAINING SIDE CHAINS AND OF AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF THESE[2014/22]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE POLYURÉTHANE-POLYURÉES CONTENANT DES CHAÎNES LATÉRALES ET DE DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DESDITS COMPOSÉS[2014/22]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2014National basic fee paid 
19.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/22]
29.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2017Fee for grant paid
08.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2014
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.05.2012
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MT22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
AT22.05.2017
IE22.05.2017
LU22.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MT22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
AT22.05.2017
IE22.05.2017
LU22.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
AT22.05.2017
IE22.05.2017
LU22.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
IE22.05.2017
LU22.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/17]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU22.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/09]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/06]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[I]US5659003  (MENOVCIK GREGORY L [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * column 2, lines 8-23 * * column 4, lines 11-25,34-59 * * example 3 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2004254292  (WILLIAMS NEAL [GB]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0071]; example 1; claim 1 *
by applicantDE2551094
 DE3049746
 EP0043966
 DE102006036220
 EP0622378
 DE102004002526
 DE4328917
 DE102004040266
 DE19649953
 WO2005078182
 US6171515
 US4599438
 US5385999
 DE4240274
    - PROG. ORG. COAT., (1981), vol. 9, pages 281 - 340,
    - S. DEDRICHS, EUROPEAN COATING JOURNAL, (2002), page 565,5,
    - MAKROMOLECULES, (2008), vol. 41, pages 4622 - 4630,
    - H. TOMITA ET AL., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (2001), pages 162 - 168,