Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2731638

EP2731638 - RAPID MANUFACTURING OF POROUS METAL PROSTHESES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
P.O. Box 708 345 East Main Street
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
[2014/21]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Jia
103 N. Orchard Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
02 / GRINER, Adam, M.
727 Graber Court
Columbia City, IN 46725 / US
 [2014/21]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date12727504.801.06.2012
WO2012US40395
Priority number, dateUS201161507151P13.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161507151 P
[2014/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013009408
Date:17.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2731638
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013
[2014/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/04, A61L27/56
[2014/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/21]
TitleGerman:SCHNELLE HERSTELLUNG PORÖSER METALLPROTHESEN[2014/21]
English:RAPID MANUFACTURING OF POROUS METAL PROSTHESES[2014/21]
French:FABRICATION RAPIDE DE PROTHÈSES MÉTALLIQUES POREUSES[2014/21]
Entry into regional phase12.02.2014National basic fee paid 
12.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/21]
10.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
04.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2004243133  (MATERNA PETER A [US]) [X] 1,3-16,18-21 * page 2, paragraph 0011 - paragraph 0020 * * page 6, paragraph 0098 - paragraph 0099 * * page 7, paragraph 0109 - paragraph 0110 * [I] 17;
 [X]US2007287027  (JUSTIN DANIEL F [US] ET AL) [X] 1-16,18-21 * page 1, paragraph 0016 * * page 2, paragraphs 0017,0018,0020 *
by applicantUS5282861