Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2715294

EP2715294 - FLOWMETER FOR TWO-PHASE GAS/LIQUID CRYOGENIC FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.05.2016  [2016/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75 quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
[2014/15]
Inventor(s)01 / DALLAIS, Antony
3 route de la Baronnerie
F-91640 Janvry / FR
02 / DUBREUIL, Thierry
7 Bis rue du Point du Jour
F-78910 Boissets / FR
03 / PATHIER, Didier
27 rue Cézanne
F-78960 Voisins Le Bretonneux / FR
04 / YOUBI-IDRISSI, Mohammed
7 Square Yves du Manoir
F-91300 Massy / FR
 [2014/15]
Representative(s)Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette
L'Air Liquide
Direction des Services
De la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/15]Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette
L'Air Liquide
Direction des Services
de la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
F-75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date12728692.015.05.2012
WO2012FR51083
Priority number, dateFR2011005455025.05.2011         Original published format: FR 1154550
[2014/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012160293
Date:29.11.2012
Language:FR
[2012/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2715294
Date:09.04.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012
[2014/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/74, G01F15/08, G01F1/00, F17C7/02, F17C13/00, F17C13/02
[2014/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/15]
TitleGerman:DURCHFLUSSMESSER FÜR ZWEIPHASIGE KRYOGENE GAS-/FLÜSSIGKEITS-FLUIDE[2014/15]
English:FLOWMETER FOR TWO-PHASE GAS/LIQUID CRYOGENIC FLUIDS[2014/15]
French:DÉBITMÈTRE POUR FLUIDES DIPHASIQUES CRYOGENIQUES GAZ/LIQUIDE[2014/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2014National basic fee paid 
02.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/15]
16.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/20]
11.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO9202788  (LPG ENG PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * page 4, line 11 - page 9, line 20; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4,5 [I] 8-12;
 [XA]US5360139  (GOODE JOHN E [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 4, line 62 - column 8, line 56; figure 1 * [A] 4,5;
 [IA]WO9510028  (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]) [I] 1-3,6 * page 6, paragraph 2eme - page 7, paragraph dernier; figures 2,4 * * page 10 * [A] 4,5;
 [IA]EP1020713  (INTEVEP SA [VE]) [I] 1,2,6,7 * column 3, paragraph 16 - paragraph 19; figure 1 * [A] 3-5;
 [IA]US6032539  (LIU KE TIEN [US], et al) [I] 1-3,6 * column 3, line 28 - column 7, line 64; figure 1 * [A] 4,5;
 [A]GB1208121  (BRITISH OXYGEN CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3930411  (BEEKER CHRISTOPH, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS5679905