Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2715927

EP2715927 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SWITCHES OF A CURRENT RECTIFIER CONNECTED TO AN ON-BOARD CHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 quai Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2017/52]
Former [2014/15]For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 quai Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / RIPOLL, Christophe
9 allée des Berges de l'Yvette
F-78460 Chevreuse / FR
02 / JANIAUD, Noëlle
62 rue de Candimanche
F-91940 Les Ulis / FR
03 / REYSS, Olivier
56 rue des Plantes
F-75014 Paris / FR
 [2014/15]
Representative(s)Rougemont, Bernard
Renault Technocentre
Département Propriété Intellectuelle
Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36
1 Avenue du Golf
78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
[2017/52]
Former [2014/18]Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2014/15]Rougemont, Bernard
Renault s.a.s
TCR GRA 2 36 - Sce 00267
1, Avenue du Golf
78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12728694.615.05.2012
[2017/52]
WO2012FR51086
Priority number, dateFR2011005446723.05.2011         Original published format: FR 1154467
US201161524014P16.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161524014 P
[2014/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012160295
Date:29.11.2012
Language:FR
[2012/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2715927
Date:09.04.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012
[2014/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2715927
Date:27.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60L11/18, H02M1/44, H02M7/217
[2017/39]
Former International [2014/15]H02M7/217, H02M1/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER SCHALTER EINES STROMRICHTERGERÄTES VERBUNDEN MIT EINGEBAUTEM LADEGERÄT[2014/15]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SWITCHES OF A CURRENT RECTIFIER CONNECTED TO AN ON-BOARD CHARGER[2014/15]
French:PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DES INTERRUPTEURS D'UN REDRESSEUR DE COURANT CONNECTE A UN CHARGEUR EMBARQUE[2014/15]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2013National basic fee paid 
21.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/15]
08.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2017Fee for grant paid
16.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2017
Opposition(s)28.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE15.05.2018
LU15.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE15.05.2018
LU15.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
LU15.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/43]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MT27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/39]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/25]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
Cited inInternational search[I]USRE38439E  (CZERWINSKI CHRISTOPHER S [US]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0034] , [0 35] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0080] * * figures 2, 4, 9-12, 14, 15 *;
 [A]CN101783607  (UNIV CHINA PETROLEUM) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
 [I]  - KLUMPNER C ET AL, "A new buck-type active front end rectifier topology with improved voltage transfer ratio and common mode voltage cancellation", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2005 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE FORTIETH IAS ANNUAL MEETING 2-6 OCT. 2005 KOWLOON, HONG KONG, CHINA, CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2005 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE FORTIETH IAS ANNUAL MEETING (IEEE CAT. NO. 05, (20051002), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/IAS.2005.1518373, ISBN 978-0-7803-9208-3, pages 631 - 638, XP010842434 [I] 1-5 * abstract * * page 632, paragraph II; figure 3 * * page 633, paragraph B * * page 634, paragraph IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.2005.1518373
 [I]  - MICHAEL H BIERHOFF ET AL, "Loss Minimized Pulse Width Modulation of IGBT Current Source Converters", IEEE INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, IECON 2006 - 32ND ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20061101), ISBN 978-1-4244-0135-2, pages 1739 - 1744, XP031077478 [I] 1-5 * page 1740, column left, paragraph III * * figures 1,2,3 *
 [I]  - KLUMPNER C ET AL, "A new class of hybrid AC/AC direct power converters", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2005 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE FORTIETH IAS ANNUAL MEETING 2-6 OCT. 2005 KOWLOON, HONG KONG, CHINA, CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2005 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE FORTIETH IAS ANNUAL MEETING (IEEE CAT. NO. 05, (20051002), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/IAS.2005.1518793, ISBN 978-0-7803-9208-3, pages 2374 - 2381, XP010842741 [I] 1-5 * page 2375, paragraph II * * figures 1b, 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.2005.1518793