Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2702593 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2132
27.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.10.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
23.10.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
23.10.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
23.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.09.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.09.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.09.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.09.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
31.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 97
25.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.08.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.08.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.08.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.08.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.08.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.08.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.08.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.08.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
25.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.08.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
22.08.2017 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
22.08.2017 Claims Opposition 10
22.08.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
22.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
22.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
22.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
16.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
16.05.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
09.05.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
20.03.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 34
15.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
15.11.2016 Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.11.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
10.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.11.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
04.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.11.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
03.11.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
05.07.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.07.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 309
25.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.05.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
25.05.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 30
25.05.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
25.05.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
25.05.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
25.05.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
25.05.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 104
26.08.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.07.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
15.07.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
15.07.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
10.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.07.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 51
26.06.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
05.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
05.06.2015 Claims Search / examination 1
05.06.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.02.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.02.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.02.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.02.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 51
22.01.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
28.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.02.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.01.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
14.01.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 10
29.11.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.11.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
18.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
18.11.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.11.2013 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 346
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 33
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 8
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 33
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 7
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 33
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 10
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 56
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 37
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 25
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 10
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 7
29.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 76
29.10.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
29.10.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
29.10.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
06.09.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.11.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 79
01.11.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
01.11.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 52
24.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.09.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
22.06.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.06.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 6
22.06.2012 Description International Searching Authority 38
22.06.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 1
22.06.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 7