blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2702593


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
02.02.2018 Revocation of patent published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
22.10.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.10.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
20.03.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
18.11.2016 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.11.2016 Change - representative
04.11.2016 Change - representative
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
04.07.2016 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
10.06.2016 Opposition filed published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
22.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
24.07.2015 (Expected) grant published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
17.07.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.07.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.07.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.07.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.02.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.06.2014 Change - extension states published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
08.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
31.01.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
20.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.2013 Amendment by applicant
18.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.11.2013 New entry: Observations by third parties
13.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2012 PCT data prior to European publication