blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2702593 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280020423 EP12728780



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014098917Global Dossier 10.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
ITPI20110046 26.04.2011
WO2012IB52100 26.04.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2014517918Global Dossier 24.07.2014A
Priority number Date
ITPI20110046 26.04.2011
WO2012IB52100 26.04.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103518237BGlobal Dossier 17.08.2016B
CN103518237 15.01.2014A
Priority number Date
ITPI20110046 26.04.2011
WO2012IB52100 26.04.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2702593Global Dossier 26.08.2015B1
EP2702593 05.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
ITPI20110046 26.04.2011
WO2012IB52100 26.04.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112013027304 24.04.2018A2
Priority number Date
ITPI20110046 26.04.2011
WO2012IB52100 26.04.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2555234T 29.12.2015T3
Priority number Date
ITPI20110046 26.04.2011
WO2012IB52100 26.04.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012147045Global Dossier 01.11.2012A1
Priority number Date
ITPI20110046 26.04.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITPI20110046 27.10.2012A1
Priority number Date
ITPI20110046 26.04.2011