Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2702593

EP2702593 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING ENERGY BY NUCLEAR REACTIONS OF HYDROGEN ADSORBED BY ORBITAL CAPTURE ON A NANOCRYSTALLINE STRUCTURE OF A METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.07.2015
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2017New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Piantelli, Silvia
Strada Petriccio-Belriguardo 120
53100 Siena (SI) / IT
For all designated states
Meiarini, Alessandro
Strada Petriccio Belriguardo 128
53100 Siena / IT
For all designated states
Ciampoli, Leonardo
Via Malibran 17
20090 Trezzano Sul Naviglio / IT
For all designated states
Chellini, Fabio
Via Piemonte 3
53100 Colle Val D'Elsa / IT
[2014/10]
Inventor(s)01 / PIANTELLI, Francesco
Strada Petriccio Belriguardo 120
I-53100 Siena / IT
 [2014/10]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Hoffmann Eitle S.R.L.
Piazza Sigmund Freud 1
20154 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/10]Celestino, Marco
ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi Viale G. Pisano, 31
56123 Pisa / IT
Application number, filing date12728780.326.04.2012
[2015/35]
WO2012IB52100
Priority number, dateIT2011PI0004626.04.2011         Original published format: IT PI20110046
[2014/10]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012147045
Date:01.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2702593
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012
[2014/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2702593
Date:26.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/35]
Search report(s)International search reportEP01.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:G21B3/00
[2014/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENERGIEERZEUGUNG DURCH NUKLEARREAKTIONEN VON DURCH ORBITALE ERFASSUNG AUF EINER NANOKRISTALLINEN STRUKTUR EINES METALLS ADSORBIERTEM WASSERSTOFF[2014/10]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING ENERGY BY NUCLEAR REACTIONS OF HYDROGEN ADSORBED BY ORBITAL CAPTURE ON A NANOCRYSTALLINE STRUCTURE OF A METAL[2014/10]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR GÉNÉRER DE L'ÉNERGIE PAR RÉACTIONS NUCLÉAIRES D'HYDROGÈNE ADSORBÉ PAR CAPTURE ORBITALE SUR UNE STRUCTURE NANOCRISTALLINE D'UN MÉTAL[2014/10]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2013National basic fee paid 
18.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2013Observations by third parties
18.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/10]
09.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.06.2015Fee for grant paid
10.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Leonardo Corporation
1331 Lincoln Road, Suite 601
Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US
Opponent's representative
Farago, Peter Andreas
FARAGO Patentanwälte
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/28]
Opponent(s)01  25.05.2016  07.06.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Leonardo Corporation
1331 Lincoln Road, Suite 601
Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US
Opponent's representative
Farago, Peter Andreas
Schieber Farago
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
05.07.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
LU26.04.2016
[2017/04]
Former [2016/36]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SI26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RO26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
SK26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/22]AT26.08.2015
CZ26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
EE26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT26.08.2015
DK26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT26.08.2015
FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI26.08.2015
HR26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
PL26.08.2015
RS26.08.2015
SE26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
IS26.12.2015
PT28.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI26.08.2015
LT26.08.2015
LV26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
GR27.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT26.08.2015
NO26.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT26.08.2015
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2010058288  (PIANTELLI SILVIA, et al) [AD] 1,8 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2009125444  (PASCUCCI MADDALENA [IT], et al) [AD] 1,8 * page 6, line 14 - line 18 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 10 * * figure 1 *;
 [AD]WO9520816  (FOCARDI SERGIO [IT], et al) [AD] 1,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0461690  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 2,3,10 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 9 *;
 [A]US3162577  (REDMAN WILLIAM C) [A] 7,21,23 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR570251  (MATERIEL TELEPHONIQUE) [A] 24 * the whole document *
 [A]  G. Bettini, "How can 30% of nickel in Rossi reactor be transmuted into copper?", Journal of Nuclear Physics, (20110404), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.journal-of-nuclear-physics.com/?p=473, (20111116), XP002664056 [A] 1,5 * page 1, paragraph l *
by applicantWO2010058288
 WO9520816
 WO2009125444
otherWO2006015864
 US2009274256
    - HOLBERT K.E., "Radiation Effects and Damage", RADIATIONEFFECTSDAMAGE, pages 1 - 10, XP003032918
    - The Significance of Helium-3 Fusion Lecture 26-03-2004. Professor G.L. Kulcinski, XP003032919
    - CHAPMAN J.J. ET AL, "Advanced fusion reactors for space propulsion and power systems", IEEE PLASMA SCIENCE (ICOPS), (20110626), pages 1 - 8, XP003032920
    - WAISBERG I., "Plasma Focus Fusion", WIKIPEDIA, (20130321), pages 1 - 4, XP003032921
    - SON S. ET AL, "Aneutronic fusion in a degenerate plasma", PHYSICS LETTERS A, (20040816), vol. 329, no. 1-2, pages 76 - 82, XP004525087

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.physleta.2004.06.054
    - Aneutronic fusion, wikipedia page 1-7, XP003032922
    - TARDITI A.G. ET AL, "Aneutronic Fusion Spacecraft Architecture", NASA-NIAC 2001, (2001), pages 1 - 33, XP003032923
    - JIANG S. ET AL, "New results of charged particles released from deuteriumloaded metal at low temperature", ICCF-14 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONDENSED MATTER NUCLEAR SCIENCE, (2008), pages 299 - 308, XP055088825
    - STORMS E. ET AL, "Detection of radiation Emitted from LENR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 14TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONDENSED MATTER NUCLEAR SCIENCE AND CONFERENCE OF COLD FUSION (ICCF-14), (20080810), pages 263 - 287, XP003032924
OppositionWO2010058288
 WO2007117475
 WO2009125444
 WO2010008625
 WO2008025737
    - Bettini G., "How can 30% of nickel in Rossi reactor be transmuted into copper?", pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.journal-of-nuclear-physics.com/?p=473, (20111116), XP002664056
    - Anonymous, "Aneutronic fusion", Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, (20010000), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Aneutronic_fusion, XP003032922
    - A.A. Harms et al.,, Principles of Fusion Energy- An Introduction to Fusion Energy for Students of Science and Engineering, World Scientific,
    - S. SON et al., "Aneutronic fusion in a degenerate plasma", Physics Letter A, (20040816), vol. 329, pages 76 - 82, XP004525087

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.physleta.2004.06.054