Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2714750

EP2714750 - PROCESS FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF WATER ABSORBABLE POLYMER PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/15]METHOD FOR CONTINUOUSLY PRODUCING WATER-ABSORBING POLYMER PARTICLES
[2014/52]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.06.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
03.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/15]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FUNK, Rüdiger
Heinrich-Heine-Str.15
65527 Niedernhausen / DE
02 / PFEIFFER, Thomas
Forststr.43
67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE
03 / SCHRÖDER, Jürgen
Niedererdstr. 20
67071 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [2014/15]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date12729029.430.05.2012
WO2012EP60075
Priority number, dateEP2011016867403.06.2011         Original published format: EP 11168674
[2014/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012163930
Date:06.12.2012
Language:DE
[2012/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2714750
Date:09.04.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012
[2014/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2714750
Date:08.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/00, C08F2/06, C08F2/18, C08F2/22
[2014/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG WASSERABSORBIERENDER POLYMERPARTIKEL[2014/15]
English:PROCESS FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF WATER ABSORBABLE POLYMER PARTICLES[2014/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ CONTINUE DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES POLYMÈRE HYDRO-ABSORBANTES[2014/52]
Former [2014/15]METHOD FOR CONTINUOUSLY PRODUCING WATER-ABSORBING POLYMER PARTICLES
Former [2014/15]PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION CONTINUE DE PARTICULES POLYMÈRES HYDROABSORBANTES
Entry into regional phase03.01.2014National basic fee paid 
03.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2013Observations by third parties
03.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/15]
23.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2015Fee for grant paid
25.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016  19.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Opponent's representative
Ricker, Mathias
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/07]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016   
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Opponent's representative
Ricker, Mathias
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
16.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.06.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition01.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1713/17
11.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
29.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.05.2012
AL08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
LU30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR08.06.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
GB30.05.2016
AT30.05.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/40]HU30.05.2012
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
LU30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR08.06.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
GB30.05.2016
AT30.05.2017
Former [2018/31]HU30.05.2012
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
LU30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR08.06.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
GB30.05.2016
Former [2018/02]HU30.05.2012
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
LU30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR08.06.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
GB30.05.2016
Former [2017/39]HU30.05.2012
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR08.06.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
GB30.05.2016
Former [2017/36]HU30.05.2012
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR08.06.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
GB30.05.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR08.06.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/25]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR08.06.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/20]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
IE30.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/09]DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/08]DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/07]DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/06]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL08.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1840137  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP2471847  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0372706
 EP0574260
 WO02055469
 WO03078378
 WO2004035514
 EP0530438
 EP0547847
 EP0559476
 EP0632068
 WO9321237
 WO03104299
 WO03104300
 WO03104301
 DE10331450
 DE10331456
 DE10355401
 DE19543368
 DE19646484
 WO9015830
 WO0232962
 WO0138402
 DE3825366
 US6241928
 WO2008040715
 WO2008052971
 EP0083022
 EP0543303
 EP0937736
 DE3314019
 DE3523617
 EP0450922
 DE10204938
 US6239230
 DE4020780
 DE19807502
 DE19807992
 DE19854573
 DE19854574
 DE10204937
 DE10334584
 EP1199327
 WO03031482
 DE3713601
    - F.L. BUCHHOLZ; A.T. GRAHAM, Modern Superabsorbent Polymer Technology, WILEY-VCH, (1998), pages 71 - 103
otherJP2006219661
 US2010298513
 WO2004052949
 US4914170
OppositionUS2006036043
 JPH06211934
 JP2006219661
 EP0574260
 WO03022896
 US6710141
 US2010197877
 WO2009095370
 WO2007023097
 US2011006140
 EP0876888
 EP0347241
 US4703067
 US2009036855
 EP1426402
 EP1415977
 EP1346974
 WO2010133460
 WO2011042429
 WO2011042468
 EP1848758
 US7893178
    - Dimerization in Acrylic Acid (A catalogue of BASF GmbH, (19920000), XP055259883
    - buchholz et al, Modern Superabsorbent Polymer Technology, (19980000), XP055259884
    - Safety guidebook for handling of acrylic acid and acrylic esters, (20021000), XP055259886