Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751584

EP2751584 - DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND DIAGNOSIS APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING A CURRENT CAPACITY OF A BATTERY CELL IN A HANDHELD MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100
9494 Schaan / LI
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / ZIEGLER, Bernd
Hardtstr. 6
86856 Hiltenfingen / DE
02 / MÜLLER, Thomas
Poststrasse 1
86836 Klosterlechfeld / DE
 [2014/38]
Former [2014/28]01 / ZIEGLER, Bernd
Chr.-Thomas-Scheffler-Strasse 1
86899 Landsberg / DE
02 / MÜLLER, Thomas
Poststrasse 1
86836 Klosterlechfeld / DE
Representative(s)Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property
Feldkircherstrasse 100
Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[2014/37]
Application number, filing date12729103.720.06.2012
WO2012EP61772
Priority number, dateDE2011108180030.08.2011         Original published format: DE102011081800
[2014/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013029826
Date:07.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2751584
Date:09.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/16
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND DIAGNOSEVORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER AKTUELLEN KAPAZITÄT EINER BATTERIEZELLE EINER HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE[2014/28]
English:DIAGNOSIS METHOD AND DIAGNOSIS APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING A CURRENT CAPACITY OF A BATTERY CELL IN A HANDHELD MACHINE TOOL[2014/28]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR DÉTERMINER LA CAPACITÉ ACTUELLE D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE D'UN OUTIL ÉLECTROPORTATIF[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2014National basic fee paid 
31.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
03.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/06]
25.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1975636  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph [0021] - page 13, paragraph [0093]; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]WO2008095315  (ADVANCED LITHIUM POWER INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 7, line 13 - page 10, line 25; figures 6-10 *;
 [X]US2004128086  (BARSOUKOV EVGENIJ [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph [0029] - page 5, paragraph [0059]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]EP1632781  (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph [0012] - page 4, paragraph [0019]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [X]JP2002243813  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [X]US2005231206  (DENNING BRUCE S [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph [0015] - page 7, paragraph [0101]; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]JP2003134678  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]US6127806  (TANJO YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 37 - column 6, line 25; figures 3-10 *;
 [A]EP1906193  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph [0033] - page 8, paragraph [0073]; figures 1-19 *;
 [A]EP1801606  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph [0019] - page 7, paragraph [0053]; figures 1-4 *;
 [XP]US2011316547  (LIU ALBERT SHIH-YOUNG [US], et al) [XP] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph [0016] - page 3, paragraph [0027]; figures 1-7 *;
 [XP]DE102011117249  (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [XP] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph [0016] - page 9, paragraph [0060]; figures 1-7 *