Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2718659

EP2718659 - CLIP-ON TARGET DESIGNATION SENSOR TO NIGHT VISION GOGGLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.03.2014
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Exelis Inc.
2235 Monroe Street
Herndon, VA 20171 / US
[2015/44]
Former [2014/16]For all designated states
Exelis Inc.
1650 Tysons Boulevard, Suite 1700
McLean, VA 22102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THOMAS, Nils, I.
766 Sunset Drive
Eagle Rock, VA 24085 / US
02 / THORSEN, Daniel, M.
820 Stayman Road
Roanoke, VA 24019 / US
03 / HINES, Kevin, P.
2 Winthrop Place
Daleville, VA 24083 / US
 [2014/16]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB
Plochinger Straße 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Steimle, Josef , et al
Magenbauer & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Plochinger Straße 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
Former [2014/16]DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12729765.329.05.2012
WO2012US39825
Priority number, dateUS20111315669609.06.2011         Original published format: US201113156696
[2014/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012170229
Date:13.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2718659
Date:16.04.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012
[2014/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:F41G1/35, G02B23/12
[2014/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/16]
TitleGerman:AUFKLEMMBARE ZIELBESTIMMUNGSSENSOR FÜR NACHTSICHTBRILLE[2014/16]
English:CLIP-ON TARGET DESIGNATION SENSOR TO NIGHT VISION GOGGLES[2014/16]
French:DÉTECTEUR À DÉSIGNATION DE CIBLE À ENCLIPSER POUR LUNETTES DE VISION NOCTURNE[2014/16]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2013National basic fee paid 
05.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/16]
07.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2009224154  (JANCIC DALE A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0005] , [0032] , [0037]; figure 10 * [Y] 5-23 [I] 4;
 [Y]US2005083567  (CHUN LIU HUI [CA] ET AL) [Y] 5-23 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO2008109978  (IVTSENKOV GENNADII [CA]; MANTSVETOV ALEXANDRE [CA]; BERIK EVGENY [EE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2002030163  (ZHANG EVAN Y W [US]) [A] 1-23 * figure 5A *;
 [A]EP1724623  (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] *