Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2726760

EP2726760 - SELF-LOCKING DIFFERENTIAL WITH OPTIMIZED RAMP ANGLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.08.2015
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.09.2015  [2015/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 quai Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2014/19]
Inventor(s)01 / PION, Emmanuel
93 rue Oberkampf
F-75011 Paris / FR
02 / BUISSON, Andre
31 Rue des Ormes
F-91150 Marolles en Beauce / FR
 [2014/19]
Representative(s)Renou, Jean-François
Renault S.A.S.
TCR GRA 2 36 - Sce 00267
1 avenue du Golf
78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date12731080.329.05.2012
WO2012FR51195
Priority number, dateFR2011005584830.06.2011         Original published format: FR 1155848
[2014/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013001195
Date:03.01.2013
Language:FR
[2013/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2726760
Date:07.05.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013
[2014/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16H48/20, F16H48/22
[2014/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/19]
TitleGerman:SELBSTSPERRENDES AUSGLEICHSGETRIEBE MIT OPTIMIERTEM RAMPENWINKEL[2014/19]
English:SELF-LOCKING DIFFERENTIAL WITH OPTIMIZED RAMP ANGLES[2014/19]
French:DIFFÉRENTIEL AUTOBLOQUANT A ANGLES DE RAMPE OPTIMISES[2014/19]
Entry into regional phase22.10.2013National basic fee paid 
22.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/19]
15.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/39]
11.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2015/39]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.11.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0733832  (LAJOUS IND S A [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US5102378  (GOBERT MICHEL [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * figures 12, 12A, 12B, 12C *;
 [A]EP0366563  (FERRY PIERRE SOC [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-12 *;
 [A]DE3841234  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,3,4,6 *;
 [A]EP0441331  (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5102378
 EP0733832
 EP0730832