Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2731633


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
19.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.06.2017  [2017/25]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
30.09.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.11.2016  [2016/44]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
22.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
23.10.2015 (Expected) grant published on  25.11.2015  [2015/48]
09.10.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.10.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.10.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.05.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.05.2015 Change - German title published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
08.05.2015 Change - English title published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
08.05.2015 Change - French title published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
13.03.2015 Change - applicant published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
19.09.2014 Change - extension states published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
16.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
12.09.2014 Change - representative published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
03.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.05.2014 Change - representative published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
18.04.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
18.04.2014 Request for examination filed published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
20.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
18.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
13.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
17.07.2012 PCT data prior to European publication