Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2731633

EP2731633 - MOBILE DEVICE FOR SUPPLY OF OZONATED LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/21]MOBILE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SUPPLY OF OZONATED LIQUID
[2015/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hesketh, Joseph James
96 Whitewood Park
Fazakerley
Liverpool
L9 7LG / GB
[2015/16]
Former [2014/21]For all designated states
Hesketh, Joseph James
Unit 29
Spindus Road
Speke Hall Industrial Estate
Liverpool, Merseyside L24 1YA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/21]
Representative(s)TLIP Limited
14 King Street
Leeds LS1 2HL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/48]TLIP Limited
Leeds Innovation Centre
103 Clarendon Road
Leeds LS2 9DF / GB
Former [2014/42]TLIP Limited
Label Media Offices
3rd Floor Broderick House
43-51 Cookridge Street
Leeds, Yorkshire LS2 3AW / GB
Former [2014/25]Clarke, Geoffrey Howard , et al
Avidity IP
Kestrel House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2014/21]Turnbull, Alexander James
avidity IP
Kestrel House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date12732855.727.06.2012
[2015/48]
WO2012GB51502
Priority number, dateGB2011001211814.07.2011         Original published format: GB 201112118
[2014/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013007979
Date:17.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2731633
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013
[2014/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2731633
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/18
[2014/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MOBILE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSORGUNG MIT EINER OZONISIERTEN FLÜSSIGKEIT[2015/24]
English:MOBILE DEVICE FOR SUPPLY OF OZONATED LIQUID[2015/24]
French:DISPOSITIF MOBILE D'APPROVISIONNEMENT D'UN LIQUIDE OZONÉ[2015/24]
Former [2014/21]MOBILE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSORGUNG MIT EINER OZONISIERTEN FLÜSSIGKEIT
Former [2014/21]MOBILE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SUPPLY OF OZONATED LIQUID
Former [2014/21]DISPOSITIF MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPROVISIONNEMENT D'UN LIQUIDE OZONÉ
Entry into regional phase14.02.2014National basic fee paid 
14.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/21]
12.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2015Fee for grant paid
06.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.06.2015
Opposition(s)26.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.06.2012
AL25.11.2015
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
LU27.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU27.06.2012
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
LU27.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/38]HU27.06.2012
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
LU27.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/31]HU27.06.2012
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
LU27.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/28]HU27.06.2012
AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/25]AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5824243  (CONTRERAS EDWARD M [US]) [X] 1-5,12 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 21 * [I] 6,7,10,11,13-15,17,18,20,23;
 [XAI]EP1351893  (TERSANO INC [CA]) [X] 15,17,19 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] - [0021] , [0026] , [0028]; figures 3,4 * [A] 1-5,9,14,23 [I] 20-22;
 [I]JPH07241332  (TOYODA SHOJI) [I] 1-9,12,15-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005163678  (CLAWSON ALLEN D [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,9,14,15,17,18,21,23 * paragraphs [0022] , [0026] , [0027] , [0030] , [0032] , [0034] *
by applicantWO9839108
 US6279589