Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2864273

EP2864273 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A PELLET FOR A DIRECT-CONVERSION DETECTOR OF X-RAYS, DIRECT-CONVERSION DETECTOR OF X-RAYS AND DENTAL RADIOLOGY APPARATUS USING SUCH A DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trophy
4 Rue Fernand Pelloutier Croissy-Beaubourg
77435 Marne La Vallée Cedex 2 / FR
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / BARBOUX, Philippe
1 villa Pierre Loti
F-94240 L'Hay les Roses / FR
02 / BIAVA, Dominique
36bis avenue Marguerite Renaudin
F-92140 Clamart / FR
03 / BINET, Laurent
116 avenue La Bruyère
F-94400 Vitry sur Seine / FR
04 / BOTHOREL, Sylvie
c/o Trophy
4 Rue Fernand Pelloutier
Croissy-Beaubourg
F-77435 Marne La Vallée Cedex 2 / FR
05 / GOURIER, Didier
182 avenue d'Italie
F-75013 Paris / FR
06 / INGLESE, Jean-Marc
5 allée de chez Swan
F-77600 Bussy St Georges / FR
07 / PONPON, Jean-Pierre
124 avenue du Général de Gaulle
F-67201 Echbolsheim / FR
08 / RAULT, Mathieu
6 rue Flatters
F-75005 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]01 / BARBOUX, Philippe
1 villa Pierre Loti
F-94240 L'Hay les Roses / FR
02 / BIAVA, Dominique
36bis avenue Marguerite Renaudin
F-92140 Clamart / FR
03 / BINET, Laurent
116 avenue La Bruyère
F-94400 Vitry sur Seine / FR
04 / BOTHOREL, Sylvie
16 rue Auguste Lancon
F-75013 Paris / FR
05 / GOURIER, Didier
182 avenue d'Italie
F-75013 Paris / FR
06 / INGLESE, Jean-Marc
5 allée de chez Swan
F-77600 Bussy St Georges / FR
07 / PONPON, Jean-Pierre
124 avenue du Général de Gaulle
F-67201 Echbolsheim / FR
08 / RAULT, Mathieu
6 rue Flatters
F-75005 Paris / FR
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date12733514.921.06.2012
WO2012FR51402
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013190187
Date:27.12.2013
Language:FR
[2013/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2864273
Date:29.04.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/645, G01T1/24, H01L31/0296, H01L31/032, H01L31/08
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PELLETS FÜR EINEN DIREKTWANDLUNGSDETEKTOR FÜR RÖNTGENSTRAHLEN, DIREKTWANDLUNGSDETEKTOR FÜR RÖNTGENSTRAHLEN UND ZAHNRÖNTGENVORRICHTUNG MIT SOLCH EINEM DETEKTOR[2015/18]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A PELLET FOR A DIRECT-CONVERSION DETECTOR OF X-RAYS, DIRECT-CONVERSION DETECTOR OF X-RAYS AND DENTAL RADIOLOGY APPARATUS USING SUCH A DETECTOR[2015/18]
French:"PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PASTILLE POUR DÉTECTEUR À CONVERSION DIRECTE DE RAYONS X, DÉTECTEUR À CONVERSION DIRECTE DE RAYONS X ET APPAREIL DE RADIOLOGIE DENTAIRE UTILISANT UN TEL DÉTECTEUR"[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2014National basic fee paid 
18.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/18]
14.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XDI]US5892227  (SCHIEBER MICHAEL MISHO [IL], et al) [XD] 1-4,7 * column 1 - column 11; figures 1-7 * [I] 5,6,8-12;
 [I]  - SCHIEBER M ET AL, "Theoretical and experimental sensitivity to X-rays of single and polycrystalline HgI2 compared with different single-crystal detectors", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS, AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NETHERLANDS, vol. 458, no. 1-2, ISSN 0168-9002, (20010201), pages 41 - 46, (20010201), XP027324597 [I] 1,2,7-12 * Sections "Introduction", "Experimental results" *
 [I]  - TURCHETTA R ET AL, "Imaging with polycrystalline mercuric iodide detectors using VLSI readout", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS, AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NETHERLANDS, (19990601), vol. 428, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0168-9002(98)01584-8, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 88 - 94, XP004169921 [I] 1,2,7-12 * Section "Introduction" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(98)01584-8
by applicantWO0068999
 US5892227
 WO9610194