EP2663952 - PURCHASER-SPECIFIC CURRENCY CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Data Corporation 6200 South Quebec Street Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | For all designated states Fexco Merchant Services Fexco Financial Services Centre Iveragh Road Killorglin Kerry / IE | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREY, Brian 595 Lakeview Drive Coral Springs Florida 33071 / US | 02 /
SHEEHY, Oghie Rossacoosane Greenane Killarney County Kerry / IE | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12734134.5 | 04.01.2012 | WO2012US20184 | Priority number, date | US201113004595 | 11.01.2011 Original published format: US201113004595 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012096810 | Date: | 19.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2663952 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/10, G06Q20/38 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0609 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/47] | G06Q20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Title | German: | KÄUFERSPEZIFISCHE WÄHRUNGSUMRECHNUNG | [2013/47] | English: | PURCHASER-SPECIFIC CURRENCY CONVERSION | [2013/47] | French: | CONVERSION DE DEVISE SPÉCIFIQUE À UN ACHETEUR | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.03.2019 | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/16] | 05.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.02.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/16] | Appeal following examination | 28.02.2019 | Appeal received No. T1811/19 | 24.05.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.02.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US7747475 (BOWMAN MARY KAY [US], et al); | [A]US2001011241 (NEMZOW MARTIN A [US]); | [A]US6892184 (KOMEM OFER [IL], et al) |