Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2729498

EP2729498 - THERAPEUTIC COMBINATIONS OF ANTI -CD20 AND ANTI - GM - CSF ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.02.2017  [2017/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MorphoSys AG
Lena-Christ-Strasse 48
82152 Planegg-Martinsried / DE
[2014/20]
Inventor(s)01 / STEIDL, Stefan
Ebenböckstr. 25
81241 München / DE
 [2014/20]
Representative(s)Chiappinelli, Susan Ann , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Sayce, Alastair George
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date12735498.306.07.2012
WO2012EP63207
Priority number, dateEP2011017286506.07.2011         Original published format: EP 11172865
US201161504744P06.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161504744 P
[2014/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013004806
Date:10.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2729498
Date:14.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013
[2014/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/28, C07K16/24, A61K39/395
[2014/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/20]
Extension statesBA22.01.2014
ME22.01.2014
TitleGerman:THERAPEUTISCHE KOMBINATIONEN VON ANTI-CD20- UND ANTI-GM-CSF-ANTIKÖRPERN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2014/20]
English:THERAPEUTIC COMBINATIONS OF ANTI -CD20 AND ANTI - GM - CSF ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF[2014/20]
French:ASSOCIATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES D'ANTICORPS ANTI-CD20 ET ANTI-GM-CSF, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2014/20]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2014National basic fee paid 
22.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/20]
19.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/08]
19.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/08]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2010124163  (THERACLONE SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * paragraphs [0126] - [0128] - [ 0422] *;
 [ID]WO2007092939  (MORPHOTEK INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * page 22 - paragraphs 0042-0043, 0068 *;
 [A]WO9411026  (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2007064911  (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [XDI]  - SAKAGAMI TAKURO ET AL, "Patient-derived Granulocyte/Macrophage Colony-Stimulating Factor Autoantibodies Reproduce Pulmonary Alveolar Proteinosis in Nonhuman Primates", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (201007), vol. 182, no. 1, pages 49 - 61, XP002663317 [XD] 1,4,6,8-12 * the whole document * [I] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/rccm.201001-0008oc
by applicantWO2010115554
 WO0027428
 WO0047228
 WO03068821
 WO2006111353
 US2009297532
 WO2007049472
 US2008317757
 WO2009064399
 US2010122819
 WO03068920
 US2004053365
 WO2007092939
 US2008292641
 WO2008141391
 US2010297135
 WO2009038760
 WO2009062238
 WO2009134805
 US2009274706
 WO2010124163
 US2010291075
 WO2009133103
 US5736137
 US5595721
 WO03002607
 US5677180
 WO2004035607
 US2007136826
    - SAKAGAMI ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2010), vol. 182, pages 49 - 61
    - KAVURU ET AL., EUR RESPIR J., (2011), vol. 38, pages 1361 - 7
    - VALLERSKOG ET AL., CLIN IMMUNOL, (2007), vol. 122, pages 62 - 74
    - TING-CHAO CHOU, THEORETICAL BASIS, EXPERIMENTAL DESIGN, AND COMPUTERIZED SIMULATION OF SYNERGISM AND ANTAGONISM IN DRUG COMBINATION STUDIES, PHARMACOL REV, (2006), vol. 58, pages 621 - 681
    - BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, (1997), vol. 46, pages 255 - 278
    - CHOTHIA C; LESK AM., "Canonical structures for the hypervariable regions of immunoglobulins", J MOL BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(87)90412-8, pages 901 - 17, XP024010426

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(87)90412-8
    - PRESS ET AL., BLOOD, (1987), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 584 - 591
    - VALENTINE ET AL., In: Leukocyte Typing III, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1987), page 440
    - INT J ONCOL., (201102), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 335 - 44
    - MOL IMMUNOL., (200805), vol. 45, no. 10, pages 2861 - 8
    - STANLEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 5592
    - MINARD-COLIN ET AL., BLOOD, (2008), vol. 112, pages 1205 - 13
 US20080675013
 US20030366709