Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2846975

EP2846975 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A PLY INVOLVED IN THE CONSTRUCTION OF A MULTIPLY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Techniwood International
Tour Panoramique
54320 Maxéville / FR
[2015/12]
Inventor(s)01 / RAUDIN, Bruno
20 rue Hector Berlioz
F-17100 Les Gonds / FR
02 / FAURE, Pascal
Le Bas
F-73400 Ugine / FR
03 / CHABRIER, Christian
Les Prés Rosset
F-74230 La Balme De Thuy / FR
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
2 allée de la Forêt de la Reine
54500 Vandoeuvre-lès-Nancy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/17]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
L'Escurial - Technopole Nancy Brabois
17 avenue de la Forêt de Haye
54500 Vandoeuvre-les-Nancy / FR
Former [2015/12]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
L'Escurial - Technolpole Nancy Brabois
17, Avenue de la Forêt de Haye
54519 Vandoeuvre les Nancy Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12735928.909.05.2012
[2016/17]
WO2012FR51023
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013167813
Date:14.11.2013
Language:FR
[2013/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2846975
Date:18.03.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2846975
Date:27.04.2016
Language:FR
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B27M3/00
[2015/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LAGE BEI DER HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRLAGIGEN PANEELS[2015/12]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A PLY INVOLVED IN THE CONSTRUCTION OF A MULTIPLY PANEL[2015/12]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN PLI ENTRANT DANS LA CONSTITUTION D'UN PANNEAU MULTI-PLIS[2015/12]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2014National basic fee paid 
09.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
11.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2016Fee for grant paid
02.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.01.2016
Opposition(s)30.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.05.2012
AL27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
IE09.05.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU09.05.2012
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
IE09.05.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/38]HU09.05.2012
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
IE09.05.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/31]HU09.05.2012
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
IE09.05.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/30]HU09.05.2012
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
IE09.05.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
IE09.05.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]DK27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/04]ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]ES27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/49]LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL27.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US1693606  (SELDEN JONES DAPHNE) [A] 1,10 * page 1, line 5 - line 29 * * page 1, line 75 - line 82 * * page 2, line 15 - line 60 * * page 2, line 71 - line 76; figure - *;
 [A]US2488759  (BOLLING OSCAR S) [A] 1,10 * column 12, line 31 - column 14, line 27; figure 3 *;
 [A]FR1246469  (SCHUDEL) [A] 1,10 * page 7, column r, paragraph l * * figure 10b *;
 [A]US647056  (WARD FRANK C [US]) [A] 1,10 * figure - *;
 [A]US2657160  (CROSTON EDWARD L) [A] 1,10 * column 9, line 10 - line 47; figure - *