Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2665556

EP2665556 - THREE WAY CONVERSION CATALYST WITH ALUMINA-FREE RHODIUM LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
17.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Corporation
100 Campus Drive
Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]For all designated states
BASF Corporation
100 Campus Drive
Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARNOLD, Mirko
An der Tiefenriede 45
30173 Hannover / DE
02 / KOTREL, Stefan
63 Autumn Ridge Road
Bedminster NJ 07921 / US
03 / WEI, Junmei
4 Springholm Drive
Berkeley Heights NJ 07922 / US
04 / SIANI, Attilio
In der Steinriede 12
30161 Honnover / DE
05 / SIEMUND, Stephan
Dammtorfeld 14
30982 Pattensen / DE
06 / WASSERMANN, Knut
58 Sayre Drive
Princeton NJ 08540 / US
 [2013/48]
Representative(s)Lux, Berthold
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]Lux, Berthold
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date12736476.817.01.2012
WO2012US21533
Priority number, dateUS201161434206P19.01.2011         Original published format: US 201161434206 P
US20121335015713.01.2012         Original published format: US201213350157
[2013/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012099868
Date:26.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2665556
Date:27.11.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012
[2013/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.10.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/46, B01J23/44, B01J37/02, B01D53/94
[2014/44]
Former International [2013/48]B01J23/46, B01J23/44, B01J37/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/48]
TitleGerman:DREIWEG-UMWANDLUNGSKATALYSATOR MIT ALUMINIUMOXIDFREIER RHODIUMSCHICHT[2013/48]
English:THREE WAY CONVERSION CATALYST WITH ALUMINA-FREE RHODIUM LAYER[2013/48]
French:CATALYSEUR DE CONVERSION TRIFONCTIONNEL POSSÉDANT UNE COUCHE DE RHODIUM EXEMPTE D'ALUMINE[2013/48]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2013National basic fee paid 
16.08.2013Search fee paid 
16.08.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
16.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/48]
23.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.03.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination09.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1963/17
20.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
28.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201403   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2014
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search
by applicantUS4171288