Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751854

EP2751854 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/28]PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT
[2015/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Epcos AG
St. Martin Str. 53
81669 München / DE
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / GLAZUNOV, Alexander
Lindenweg 16/10
8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT
02 / FELTZ, Adalbert
Burgeggerstr. 50
A-8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2014/28]
Application number, filing date12737845.324.07.2012
[2015/48]
WO2012EP64538
Priority number, dateDE20111011200830.08.2011         Original published format: DE102011112008
[2014/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013029884
Date:07.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2751854
Date:09.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2751854
Date:25.11.2015
Language:DE
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/273
[2015/23]
Former International [2014/28]H01L41/187, H01L41/047, H01L41/39
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PIEZOELEKTRISCHEN BAUELEMENTS[2015/23]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT[2015/23]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE[2015/23]
Former [2014/28]PIEZOELEKTRISCHES BAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PIEZOELEKTRISCHEN BAUELEMENTS
Former [2014/28]PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT
Former [2014/28]COMPOSANT PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE
Entry into regional phase18.03.2014National basic fee paid 
18.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
08.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2015Fee for grant paid
02.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2015
Opposition(s)26.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.07.2012
AL25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
GB24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU24.07.2012
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
GB24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/38]HU24.07.2012
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
GB24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/31]HU24.07.2012
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
GB24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU24.07.2012
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
GB24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/36]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
GB24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/23]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
GB24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.07.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/25]ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/24]ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[YA]DE102005061528  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0012] , [0014] - [0016] - [0018] , [0037] , [0038] , [0040]; figure 1 * [A] 5-15;
 [Y]WO0145138  (EPCOS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 8, lines 13-24 * * page 9, lines 1-11 * * page 17, lines 10-21 * * figure 3 *;
 [Y]EP1959510  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0011] , [0026] , [0030] *;
 [A]DE102008042965  (CERAMTEC AG [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0016] , [0034] *