EP2734534 - IMINO-SUGAR C-GLYCOSIDES, PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Pierre et Marie Curie (Paris 6) 4, Place Jussieu 75005 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Dorphan S.A. Parc Scientifique EPFL, PSE 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2014/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLLOGOUB, Matthieu 2 Square de Clignancourt F-75018 Paris / FR | 02 /
BLERIOT, Yves 115 Promenade des cours F-86000 Poitiers / FR | 03 /
PRENCIPE, Giuseppe 12 rue du Molinet F-75013 Paris / FR | 04 /
AUBERGER, Nicolas 5 boulevard Pont Achard F-86000 Poitiers / FR | [2014/22] | Representative(s) | Tezier Herman, Béatrice, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2014/22] | Application number, filing date | 12738107.7 | 19.07.2012 | WO2012EP64212 | Priority number, date | EP20110305942 | 20.07.2011 Original published format: EP 11305942 | [2014/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013011098 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2734534 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07H13/04, A61K31/7024, A61P3/10 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
C07D211/56 (EP,US);
A61P15/16 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/22] | Title | German: | IMINOZUCKER-C-GLYCOSIDE, HERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/22] | English: | IMINO-SUGAR C-GLYCOSIDES, PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | [2014/22] | French: | C-GLYCOSIDES D'IMINOSUCRES, LEUR PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION | [2014/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0230581 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [A]WO2008059267 (UNIV DUNDEE [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [A] - ASANO N ET AL, "Homonojirimycin Isomers and N-Alkylated Homonojirimycins: Structural and Conformational Basis of Inhibition of Glycosidases", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19980702), vol. 41, no. 14, doi:10.1021/JM970836L, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2565 - 2571, XP002293494 [A] 1-15 * page 2566 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970836l | [A] - LEGLER G ET AL, "Bovine N-acetyl-beta-d-glucosaminidase: affinity purification and characterization of its active site with nitrogen containing analogs of N-acetylglucosamine", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. PROTEIN STRUCTURE AND MOLECULAR ENZYMOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM; NL, vol. 1080, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0167-4838(91)90133-K, ISSN 0167-4838, (19911025), pages 89 - 95, (19911025), XP023579140 [A] 1-15 * table III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4838(91)90133-K | [A] - GRANIER, THIERRY ET AL, "Synthesis and some transformations of 2-acetamido-5-amino-3,4,6-tri-O-benzyl-2,5-dideoxy-D-glucono-1,5-lactam", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA , 81(5), 865-880 CODEN: HCACAV; ISSN: 0018-019X, (1998), XP002659909 [A] 1-15 * page 686; compounds 30,37,36 * | by applicant | - A. VASELLA, HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1998), page 865 | - T. LIU; YM ZHANG; Y. BLERIOT, SYNLETT, (2007), pages 905 - 908 | - N. ARDES-GUISOT ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL.CHEM., (2011), vol. 9, page 5373 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - KATO, A.; MIYAUCHI, S.; KATO, N.; NASH, R. J.; YOSHIMURA, Y.; NAKAGOME, I.; HIRONO, S.; TAKAHATA, H.; ADACHI, I., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2011), vol. 19, pages 3558 - 3568 |