Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2714548

EP2714548 - METHOD AND PACKAGE FOR FLAT ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.05.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuova Sima S.p.A.
Via Selice Provinciale, 17/A
40026 Imola (BO) / IT
[2014/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BARDI, Maurizio
Via Toscanini 20/B
I-41043 Formigine (MO) / IT
 [2014/15]
Representative(s)Dall'Olio, Christian , et al
INVENTION S.r.l. Via delle Armi, 1
40137 Bologna / IT
[2014/15]
Application number, filing date12738200.012.06.2012
WO2012IB52968
Priority number, dateIT2011BO0034214.06.2011         Original published format: IT BO20110342
[2014/15]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012172485
Date:20.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2714548
Date:09.04.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012
[2014/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:B65D85/46, B65D85/62, B65D81/05
[2014/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VERPACKUNG FÜR FLACHE GEGENSTÄNDE[2014/15]
English:METHOD AND PACKAGE FOR FLAT ARTICLES[2014/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET EMBALLAGE POUR ARTICLES PLATS[2014/15]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2014National basic fee paid 
03.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/15]
24.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
10.03.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination13.04.2015Appeal received No.  T1684/15
03.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
03.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1323645  (L I C A S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1a,1b * * column 2, line 8 - line 9 * * paragraph [0013] *;
 [Y]FR2621895  (PARISOT STE NLE FABRIQUES MEUB [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 2; figure 1 * * page 7, line 22 * * page 9, line 14 - line 19 *;
 [A]EP0994043  (GOMES TECHNOLOGY S P A [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0007]; figures 1,2 *
by applicantWO2007148183